House of Hunan Express, Inc. v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: House of Hunan Express, Inc.
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 8:2021cv00096
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - The deposition deadline, including but not limited to depositions for oral testimony only under Rule 45, is April 1, 2022. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A status conference to discuss case progression, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge by telephone on May 17, 2022 at 1:00 p.m. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. (Filing No. #9 .) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
May 4, 2021 Filing 15 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis.Planning Conference held on 5/4/2021. (RMW)
April 30, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO RULE 26(A)(1) by Attorney Thomas J. Culhane on behalf of Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (Culhane, Thomas)
April 30, 2021 Filing 13 Certificate of Service of Initial Disclosures by Attorney Michael W. Milone on behalf of Plaintiff House of Hunan Express, Inc..(Milone, Michael)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: As requested by the parties in their Rule 26(f) Report, a Planning Conference will be held on 5/4/2021 at 03:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Telephone conference instructions are found at Filing No. #9 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
April 16, 2021 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Michael W. Milone on behalf of Plaintiff House of Hunan Express, Inc..(Milone, Michael)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 4/16/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESTRICTED TELEPHONE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS AND ORDER. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
March 16, 2021 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Attorney Michael W. Milone on behalf of Plaintiff House of Hunan Express, Inc..(Milone, Michael)
March 16, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (Culhane, Thomas)
March 11, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. by Attorney Thomas J. Culhane on behalf of Defendants Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Travelers Property Casualty Corp., The Travelers Companies, Inc..(Culhane, Thomas)
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Michael W. Milone on behalf of Plaintiff House of Hunan Express, Inc..(Milone, Michael)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff House of Hunan Express, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4355395) with attached state court pleadingsTravelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -- Complaint, Praecipe, and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit -- Summons, #3 Exhibit -- Service Return)(Culhane, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: House of Hunan Express, Inc. v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Thomas J. Culhane
Represented By: Matthew B. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: House of Hunan Express, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. McClellan
Represented By: Michael W. Milone
Represented By: David J. Koukol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?