Sivertson v. HeartFlow, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brian L Sivertson
Defendant: HeartFlow, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2021cv00112
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Filing 11 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss #6 by Attorney Darren E. Nadel on behalf of Defendant HeartFlow, Inc..(Nadel, Darren)
April 28, 2021 Filing 10 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss #6 by Attorney Patrick M. Flood on behalf of Plaintiff Brian L Sivertson.(Flood, Patrick)
April 21, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Darren E. Nadel on behalf of Defendant HeartFlow, Inc..(Nadel, Darren)
April 9, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant HeartFlow, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Joseph F. Bataillon for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
April 8, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Attorney Darren E. Nadel on behalf of Defendant HeartFlow, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Nadel, Darren)
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant HeartFlow, Inc. on 3/18/2021. (Flood, Patrick)
March 16, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant HeartFlow, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
March 16, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
March 16, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to HeartFlow, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Flood, Patrick)
March 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against HeartFlow, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4359867), by Attorney Patrick M. Flood on behalf of Brian L Sivertson(Flood, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sivertson v. HeartFlow, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HeartFlow, Inc.
Represented By: Darren E. Nadel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian L Sivertson
Represented By: Patrick M. Flood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?