Recon Roofing and Construction, LLC. v. Pinnacle Bank
Plaintiff: Recon Roofing and Construction, LLC.
Defendant: Pinnacle Bank
Case Number: 8:2021cv00168
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 7/2/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESTRICTED TELEPHONE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS AND ORDER. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
May 21, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Pinnacle Bancorp for Pinnacle Bank. by Attorney Nicholas A. Buda on behalf of Defendants Pinnacle Bank, Pinnacle Bancorp.(Buda, Nicholas)
May 21, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Pinnacle Bank (Wright, T.)
May 4, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Benjamin R. Merrill on behalf of Plaintiff Recon Roofing and Construction, LLC..(Merrill, Benjamin)
May 3, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Pinnacle Bank on 4/30/2021. (Borland, Nathan)
April 27, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant Pinnacle Bank. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Borland, Nathan)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Recon Roofing and Construction, LLC.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4383491), by Attorney Nathan J. Borland on behalf of Recon Roofing and Construction, LLC.(Borland, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Recon Roofing and Construction, LLC. v. Pinnacle Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Recon Roofing and Construction, LLC.
Represented By: Nathan J. Borland
Represented By: Benjamin R. Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Bank
Represented By: Nicholas A. Buda
Represented By: T. Randall Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?