1240 S 10th Street, LLC v. Amguard Insurance Company
Plaintiff: 1240 S 10th Street, LLC
Defendant: Amguard Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2021cv00172
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. An interim status conference as requested (Filing No. #15 ) to discuss case progression and the parties' interest in settlement will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge by telephone on October 7, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. (Filing No. #11 .) The deposition deadline, including but not limited to depositions for oral testimony only under Rule 45, is March 30, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
June 4, 2021 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Justin D. Eichmann on behalf of Plaintiff 1240 S 10th Street, LLC.(Eichmann, Justin)
May 27, 2021 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #13 for attorney Jennifer Price. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
May 26, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4407078 by Attorney Jennifer Price on behalf of Plaintiff 1240 S 10th Street, LLC.(Price, Jennifer)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 6/4/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESTRICTED TELEPHONE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS AND ORDER. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
April 30, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Amguard Insurance Company (Culhane, Thomas)
April 30, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Amguard Insurance Company (Culhane, Thomas)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - Pursuant to the magistrate judge's order of recusal (filing #7 ), case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis for judicial supervision and remains assigned to District Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. for disposition. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (JAB)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Upon review of the docket in the above-designated case, the undersigned judge shall, and hereby does, recuse himself from the above-designated case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a). The clerk shall refer the file to the Chief Judge for reassignment to a different magistrate judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JAB)
April 29, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Justin D. Eichmann on behalf of Plaintiff 1240 S 10th Street, LLC.(Eichmann, Justin)
April 28, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent National Indemnity Company, a Nebraska corporation, Corporate Parent WestGUARD Insurance Company for Amguard Insurance Company. by Attorney Thomas J. Culhane on behalf of Defendants Amguard Insurance Company, WestGUARD Insurance Company, National Indemnity Company, a Nebraska corporation, Berkshire Hathaway, Inc..(Culhane, Thomas)
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff 1240 S 10th Street, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Amguard Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against 1240 S 10th Street, LLC from District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number CI 21-2694 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4385006) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Thomas J. Culhane on behalf of Amguard Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit --Complaint and Jury Demand and Praecipe, #2 Exhibit -- Summons, #3 Exhibit -- Service Return)(Culhane, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1240 S 10th Street, LLC v. Amguard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1240 S 10th Street, LLC
Represented By: Justin D. Eichmann
Represented By: Jennifer Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amguard Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew B. Reilly
Represented By: Thomas J. Culhane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?