Brotherhood of Maintentance of Way Employes, Division, IBT v. Union Pacific Railroad, Co.
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Maintentance of Way Employes, Division, IBT
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Co. and Union Pacific Railroad, Co.
Case Number: 8:2021cv00224
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting the parties' Joint #18 Motion to set the briefing schedule. Plaintiff Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes, Division, IBT, shall file its combined response to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. #13 ) and reply in support of Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. #6 ) on or before September 1, 2021. Defendant Union Pacific shall file a response to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. #6 ) on or before September 29, 2021. The reply shall be subject to the word limits for Response Briefs set forth in NeCivR 7.1(d)(1)(A). In all other respects, case progression deadlines are stayed pending further order of the court. If the case is not fully resolved by summary judgment, within 10 days following a ruling on pending motions, Counsel shall contact the undersigned magistrate judges chambers to schedule a conference call to set case progression deadlines. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
August 4, 2021 Filing 18 JOINT MOTION Joint Motion to Set Briefing Schedule regarding MOTION for Summary Judgment #6 , MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment #13 by Attorney Andrew J. Rolfes on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad, Co..(Rolfes, Andrew)
August 2, 2021 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Brant Hanquist by Attorney Andrew J. Rolfes on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad, Co..(Rolfes, Andrew)
July 30, 2021 Filing 16 ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED regarding Index, #15 . Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Neal Hathaway by Attorney Andrew J. Rolfes on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad, Co..(Rolfes, Andrew)
July 30, 2021 Filing 15 INDEX MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment #13 Index of Exhibits by Attorney Andrew J. Rolfes on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad, Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Declaration of Brant Hanquist, #2 Exhibit 2- Declaration of Anthony Bernhard, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Manny Arambulo)(Rolfes, Andrew)
July 30, 2021 Filing 14 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment #13 by Attorney Andrew J. Rolfes on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad, Co..(Rolfes, Andrew)
July 30, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by Attorney Andrew J. Rolfes on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad, Co..(Rolfes, Andrew)
July 30, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Union Pacific Railroad, Co. (Rolfes, Andrew)
July 9, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Union Pacific Corporation for Union Pacific Railroad, Co.. by Attorney Andrew J. Rolfes on behalf of Defendants Union Pacific Railroad, Co., Union Pacific Corporation.(Rolfes, Andrew)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. 1) Defendant shall file an answer or other responsive pleading on or before July 30, 2021. 2) Defendant's deadline to file a response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (Filing No. #6 ) is extended to July 30, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CEW)
July 9, 2021 Filing 9 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading (Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment) to by Attorney Andrew J. Rolfes on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad, Co..(Rolfes, Andrew)
June 29, 2021 Filing 8 INDEX in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment #6 by Attorney Robert E. O'Connor, Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Brotherhood of Maintentance of Way Employes, Division, IBT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Tony Cardwell, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Louis Below, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Dennis Albers, #4 Exhibit Declaration of John McArthur)(O'Connor, Robert)
June 29, 2021 Filing 7 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment #6 by Attorney Robert E. O'Connor, Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Brotherhood of Maintentance of Way Employes, Division, IBT.(O'Connor, Robert)
June 29, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Attorney Robert E. O'Connor, Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Brotherhood of Maintentance of Way Employes, Division, IBT.(O'Connor, Robert)
June 27, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Union Pacific Railroad, Co. on 6/21/2021. (O'Connor, Robert)
June 16, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Union Pacific Railroad Co. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
June 16, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
June 15, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Union Pacific Railroad regarding Complaint #1 . (O'Connor, Robert)
June 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Union Pacific Railroad Co. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4417799), by Attorney Robert E. O'Connor, Jr. on behalf of Brotherhood of Maintentance of Way Employes, Division, IBT(O'Connor, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brotherhood of Maintentance of Way Employes, Division, IBT v. Union Pacific Railroad, Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad, Co.
Represented By: Andrew J. Rolfes
Represented By: Jacquelyn V. Clark
Represented By: Robert S. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Maintentance of Way Employes, Division, IBT
Represented By: Richard S. Edelman
Represented By: Robert E. O'Connor, Jr.
Represented By: Aaron S. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?