Bjorman v. Alegent Health - Bergan Mercy Health Systems
Plaintiff: Deborah Bjorman
Defendant: Alegent Health - Bergan Mercy Health Systems doing business as Alegant Creighton Health Bergan Mercy Health System doing business as CHI Health Creighton Universtiy Medical Center - Bergan Mercy
Case Number: 8:2021cv00259
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Brian C Buescher
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Susan M. Napolitano is terminated as counsel of record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
September 7, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Katherine A. McNamara on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Bjorman (McNamara, Katherine)
September 7, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Jordan W. Adam on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Bjorman (Adam, Jordan)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Order Deadlines. The deadline for the Rule 26(f) Report and mandatory disclosures is extended to September 17, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
August 19, 2021 Filing 10 JOINT STIPULATION regarding Scheduling Order #7 by Attorney Susan M Napolitano on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Bjorman.(Napolitano, Susan)
August 18, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Sarah Rafie Pineau on behalf of Defendant Alegent Health - Bergan Mercy Health Systems (Rafie Pineau, Sarah)
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney Susan M Napolitano on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Bjorman.(Napolitano, Susan)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 8/19/2021.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (MKR)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RESTRICTED TELEPHONE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS AND ORDER. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Alegent Health - Bergan Mercy Health Systems (Schuering, Emma)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 THE ATTORNEY HAS BEEN NOTIFIED THAT THIS ENTRY WAS DOCKETED IN ERROR - TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Alegent Health - Bergan Mercy Health Systems. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LAC) Modified on 7/13/2021 (LAC).
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LAC)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent CommonSpirit Health, Corporate Parent CHI Nebraska, d/b/a CHI Health for Alegent Health - Bergan Mercy Health Systems. by Attorney Emma R. Schuering on behalf of Defendants Alegent Health - Bergan Mercy Health Systems, CHI Nebraska, d/b/a CHI Health, CommonSpirit Health.(Schuering, Emma)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Deborah Bjorman from Douglas County District Court, Case number CI 21 0006291 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4434106) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Emma R. Schuering on behalf of Alegent Health - Bergan Mercy Health Systems (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint)(Schuering, Emma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bjorman v. Alegent Health - Bergan Mercy Health Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Bjorman
Represented By: Christopher M. Ferdico
Represented By: Susan M Napolitano
Represented By: Jordan W. Adam
Represented By: Katherine A. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alegent Health - Bergan Mercy Health Systems doing business as Alegant Creighton Health Bergan Mercy Health System doing business as CHI Health Creighton Universtiy Medical Center - Bergan Mercy
Represented By: Emma R. Schuering
Represented By: Sarah Rafie Pineau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?