Davis v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Lisa Joy Davis
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 8:2021cv00294
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Kilolo Kijakazi on 8/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed on Attorney General of USA, Department of Justice, #2 Summons Executed on Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Region VI, SSA)(Chermol, David)
August 3, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (1- Social Security Administration, 1- U.S. Attorney General, 1- U.S. Attorney). YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER approving the Plaintiff's Application to #2 Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Plaintiff may proceed in this matter without prepaying fees or costs. This order is entered without prejudice to the court later entering an order taxingcosts in this case. No one, including any plaintiff, is relieved by this order from theobligation to pay or to reimburse taxable costs after this action is over. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (MKR)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2015-05: In the Matter of Procedures for Social Security Cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LKO)
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #4 for attorney David F. Chermol. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney David F. Chermol on behalf of Plaintiff Lisa Joy Davis (Chermol, David)
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4448231 by Attorney David F. Chermol on behalf of Plaintiff Lisa Joy Davis. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Oath of Admission, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Chermol, David)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Kilolo Kijakazi regarding Complaint #1 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons USAG, #2 Proposed Summons USAO)(Chermol, David)
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Attorney David F. Chermol on behalf of Plaintiff Lisa Joy Davis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chermol, David)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, by Attorney David F. Chermol on behalf of Lisa Joy Davis (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chermol, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Joy Davis
Represented By: David F. Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?