Speirs et al v. Mouth of the South; CBD, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Emily Speirs and M.S.
Defendant: Mouth of the South; CBD, LLC, Cutchall Management Company, Inc. and Ryan D. Ernst
Case Number: 8:2021cv00298
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Brian C Buescher
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 15 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Mouth of the South; CBD, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
September 28, 2021 Filing 14 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Cutchall Management Company, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
September 17, 2021 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #12 for attorney Patrick F. Hulla. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
September 16, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4478425 by Attorney Patrick F. Hulla on behalf of Defendants Cutchall Management Company, Inc., Ryan D. Ernst, Mouth of the South; CBD, LLC.(Hulla, Patrick)
September 16, 2021 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #10 for attorney Darin Shreves. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
September 16, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4478097 by Attorney Darin Shreves on behalf of Defendants Cutchall Management Company, Inc., Ryan D. Ernst, Mouth of the South; CBD, LLC.(Shreves, Darin)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by October 14, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
September 16, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney AnnRene S. Coughlin on behalf of Defendant Cutchall Management Company, Inc..(Coughlin, AnnRene)
August 27, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Ryan D. Ernst on 8/20/2021. (Sanford, Josh)
August 27, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Mouth of the South; CBD, LLC on 8/20/2021. (Sanford, Josh)
August 27, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Cutchall Management Company, Inc. on 8/16/2021. (Sanford, Josh)
August 6, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Cutchall Management Company, Inc., Ryan D. Ernst, Mouth of the South; CBD, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (ADB)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (ADB)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Mouth of the South; CBD, LLC, Cutchall Management Company, Inc., and Ryan D. Ernst regarding Complaint, #1 . (Sanford, Josh)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cutchall Management Company, Inc., Ryan D. Ernst, Mouth of the South; CBD, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4451075), by Attorney Josh Sanford on behalf of Emily Speirs, M.S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Server Collective -- Emily Speirs, #2 Exhibit Consent to Join Hourly Employee Collective -- Emily Speirs, #3 Exhibit Consent to Join Hourly Employee Collective -- M.S.)(Sanford, Josh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Speirs et al v. Mouth of the South; CBD, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Speirs
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.S.
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mouth of the South; CBD, LLC
Represented By: AnnRene S. Coughlin
Represented By: Darin Shreves
Represented By: Patrick F. Hulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutchall Management Company, Inc.
Represented By: AnnRene S. Coughlin
Represented By: Darin Shreves
Represented By: Patrick F. Hulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan D. Ernst
Represented By: AnnRene S. Coughlin
Represented By: Darin Shreves
Represented By: Patrick F. Hulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?