Godfather's Pizza, Inc. v. Grab N Go, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Godfather's Pizza, Inc.
Defendant: Grab N Go, LLC and Arifa Keshwani Surani
Case Number: 8:2021cv00310
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendants Grab N Go, LLC and Arifa Keshwani Surani. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (Copies mailed to defendants) (LAC)
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against Grab N Go, LLC and Afrifa Keshwani Surani by Attorney Richard P. Jeffries on behalf of Plaintiff Godfather's Pizza, Inc..(Jeffries, Richard)
August 31, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Arifa Keshwani Surani defendant Arifa Keshwani Surani on 8/21/2021. (Jeffries, Richard)
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Grab N Go, LLC on 8/21/2021. (Jeffries, Richard)
August 18, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Richard P. Jeffries on behalf of Plaintiff Godfather's Pizza, Inc..(Jeffries, Richard)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendants Grab N Go, LLC and Arifa Keshwani Surani. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
August 17, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to Grab N Go, LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Jeffries, Richard)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to Arifa Keshwani Surani regarding Complaint #1 . (Jeffries, Richard)
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding trademark numbers 2,980,637; 1,114,984; 2,386,870; and 2,398,968. Complaint filed on 8/16/21. Notification sent to the U.S. Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (LKO)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Godfather's Pizza, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Grab N Go, LLC, Arifa Keshwani Surani ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4457051), by Attorney Richard P. Jeffries on behalf of Godfather's Pizza, Inc.(Jeffries, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Godfather's Pizza, Inc. v. Grab N Go, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Godfather's Pizza, Inc.
Represented By: Richard P. Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grab N Go, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arifa Keshwani Surani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?