Lammers v. Ag Valley Cooperative Non-Stock
Plaintiff: Jess T. Lammers
Defendant: Ag Valley Cooperative Non-Stock
Case Number: 8:2021cv00354
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER granting the Plaintiff's #19 Motion to Continue, the parties need not file a Rule 26(f) report. Depositions due August 26, 2022. Status Conference set for 4/26/2022 at 11:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
October 12, 2021 Filing 21 AUDIO FILE. Court Date & Time [ 10/12/2021 1:58:19 PM ]. File Size [ 5771 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:24:03 ]. (Planning Conference). (auto-docket).
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER SETTING HEARING: A telephone conference is set for October 12, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. before the undersigned magistrate judge to discuss the Rule 26(f) Report. The parties shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the call. (Filing No. #18 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CEW)
October 7, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Continue Rule 26(f) Report on behalf of Plaintiff Jess T. Lammers.(Lammers, Jess)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 10/18/2021.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
September 16, 2021 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, Financial Interest, and Business Entity Citizenship by Attorney Michaelle L. Baumert on behalf of Defendant Ag Valley Cooperative Non-Stock.(Baumert, Michaelle)
September 16, 2021 Filing 15 Defendant's ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Ag Valley Cooperative Non-Stock (Baumert, Michaelle)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Unopposed Motion to Change Place of Trial to the North Platte Division. This action was initially filed in the District Court of Furnas County, Nebraska, and was removed to this forum. Plaintiff has moved to change the trial location to North Platte, Nebraska. (Filing No. 13). Defendant has informed the court that it does not oppose Plaintiff's request to change the location of trial. The motion (Filing No. 13) is granted and this case will be tried in North Platte, Nebraska. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JLK)
September 14, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED MOTION to Change Place of Trial to NORTH PLATTE LINCOLN COUNTY NEBRASKA on behalf of Plaintiff Jess T. Lammers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A certification, & SSA Medical Report)(Lammers, Jess)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's filing at ECF No. 9 is construed as a motion to change the location of trial to Phelps County, Nebraska. Plaintiff's motion (ECF No. 9) is denied. On or before September 28, 2021, Plaintiff is given leave to reassert his motion as either: (1) a motion to remand this case to state court (to proceed in Furnas County, Nebraska); or (2) a motion to change the trial location in the federal proceedings to North Platte, Lincoln County, Nebraska. See NECivR 40.1(b). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JLK)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: There is currently no motion or proceeding pending for which the court must or should review evidence. As such, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's motions to admit records into evidence, #8 and #10 , are denied without prejudice to re-asserting if and when such evidence becomes relevant to an issue pending for the court's consideration and ruling. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
September 14, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED MOTION to Compel material facts as evidence on behalf of Plaintiff Jess T. Lammers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit medical record, #2 Exhibit medical record, #3 Exhibit voc rehab certification)(Lammers, Jess)
September 14, 2021 Filing 9 lammers, Jess t ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 , COUNTERCLAIM location of trial against All Defendants regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 filed by Ag Valley Cooperative Non-Stock by Jess T. Lammers (Lammers, Jess)
September 14, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel performance evaluation as material fact on behalf of Plaintiff Jess T. Lammers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PERFORMANCE EVALUATION)(Lammers, Jess)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: There is currently no motion or proceeding pending for which the court must or should review evidence. As such, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to admit medical records, #6 , is denied without prejudice to re-asserting if and when such evidence becomes relevant to an issue pending for the court's consideration and ruling. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
September 14, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel material facts evidence on behalf of Plaintiff Jess T. Lammers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A certification, #2 Exhibit medical record, #3 Exhibit medical record)(Lammers, Jess)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #4 . This order is entered without prejudice to the court later entering an order taxing costs in this case. No one, including any plaintiff, is relieved by this order from the obligation to pay or to reimburse taxable costs after this action is over. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
September 13, 2021 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis app, motion, & affidavit on behalf of Plaintiff Jess T. Lammers.(Lammers, Jess)
September 13, 2021 Remark - Public: CM/ECF NextGen e-filing request from pro se plaintiff Jess T. Lammers received and access granted on 9/13/21. (JLS)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Ag Valley Cooperative Non-Stock. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Ag Valley Cooperative Non-Stock from District Court of Furnas County Nebraska, Case number CI 21-94 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4473480) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Michaelle L. Baumert on behalf of Ag Valley Cooperative Non-Stock (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baumert, Michaelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lammers v. Ag Valley Cooperative Non-Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jess T. Lammers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ag Valley Cooperative Non-Stock
Represented By: Brock J. Pohlmeier
Represented By: Michaelle L. Baumert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?