Colby 2021, LLC v. City of Plainview et al
Plaintiff: Colby 2021, LLC
Defendant: City of Plainview, Brian Schlote, Bob Smith, Tyler Sanne, Bryon Alder and Pam Yosten
Case Number: 8:2021cv00359
Filed: September 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Defendant All Defendants, by Attorney Alexa B. Barton on behalf of Colby 2021, LLC(Barton, Alexa)
October 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Mark D. Fitzgerald on behalf of Defendants Bryon Alder, City of Plainview, Tyler Sanne, Brian Schlote, Bob Smith, Pam Yosten (Fitzgerald, Mark)
October 4, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Pam Yosten. Waiver sent on 9/24/2021. (Fitzgerald, Mark)
October 4, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Bob Smith. Waiver sent on 9/24/2021. (Fitzgerald, Mark)
October 4, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Brian Schlote. Waiver sent on 9/24/2021. (Fitzgerald, Mark)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Tyler Sanne. Waiver sent on 9/24/2021. (Fitzgerald, Mark)
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Bryon Alder. Waiver sent on 9/24/2021. (Fitzgerald, Mark)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant City of Plainview. Waiver sent on 9/24/2021. (Fitzgerald, Mark)
September 24, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Defendant Bryon Alder, City of Plainview, Tyler Sanne, Brian Schlote, Bob Smith, Pam Yosten, by Attorney David A. Lopez on behalf of Colby 2021, LLC(Lopez, David)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney David A. Lopez on behalf of Plaintiff Colby 2021, LLC.(Lopez, David)
September 14, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
September 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bryon Alder, City of Plainview, Tyler Sanne, Brian Schlote, Bob Smith, Pam Yosten ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4475873), by Attorney David A. Lopez on behalf of Colby 2021, LLC(Lopez, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colby 2021, LLC v. City of Plainview et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colby 2021, LLC
Represented By: Alexa B. Barton
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Represented By: Kamron T.M. Hasan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Plainview
Represented By: Mark D. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Schlote
Represented By: Mark D. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Smith
Represented By: Mark D. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Sanne
Represented By: Mark D. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryon Alder
Represented By: Mark D. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Yosten
Represented By: Mark D. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?