Urgent Care Clinic of Lincoln, P.C. v. Cigna Healthcare, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Urgent Care Clinic of Lincoln, P.C.
Defendant: Cigna Healthcare, Inc., Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company and Cigna Corporation
Case Number: 8:2021cv00360
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 16 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Deadline to File Dismissal Documents by Attorney Christopher M. Schmidt on behalf of Plaintiff Urgent Care Clinic of Lincoln, P.C..(Schmidt, Christopher)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay or Continue Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond (Filing No. #14 ) is granted. Defendants' answer deadline is stayed pending the finalization of the parties settlement. On or before November 12, 2021, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) which will fully dispose of the case; Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice; and The Clerk of Court shall terminate all other outstanding deadlines in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
October 12, 2021 Filing 14 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay or Continue Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Attorney David A. Lopez on behalf of Defendants Cigna Corporation, Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Cigna Healthcare, Inc..(Lopez, David)
September 30, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney David A. Lopez on behalf of Defendant Cigna Healthcare, Inc..(Lopez, David)
September 30, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney David A. Lopez on behalf of Defendant Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company.(Lopez, David)
September 30, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney David A. Lopez on behalf of Defendant Cigna Corporation.(Lopez, David)
September 28, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Susan M. Foster on behalf of Plaintiff Urgent Care Clinic of Lincoln, P.C..(Foster, Susan)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall have an extension of time to October 13, 2021, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
September 21, 2021 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney David A. Lopez on behalf of Defendants Cigna Corporation, Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Cigna Healthcare, Inc..(Lopez, David)
September 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Marnie A. Jensen on behalf of Defendants Cigna Corporation, Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Cigna Healthcare, Inc. (Jensen, Marnie)
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Urgent Care Clinic of Lincoln, P.C. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Cigna Healthcare, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Cigna Corporation. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Defendants from District Court of Lancaster County, Case number CI 21-3266 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4477217) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney David A. Lopez on behalf of Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Cigna Corporation, Cigna Healthcare, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lopez, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Urgent Care Clinic of Lincoln, P.C. v. Cigna Healthcare, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Urgent Care Clinic of Lincoln, P.C.
Represented By: Christopher M. Schmidt
Represented By: Susan M. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Represented By: Marnie A. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Represented By: Marnie A. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Corporation
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Represented By: Marnie A. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?