Johnson et al v. C.R. England, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Rentz Johnson and George Johnson
Defendant: C.R. England, Inc. and Dyllan Andrus Miller
Case Number: 8:2021cv00363
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROTECTIVE ORDER Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order, (Filing No. #12 ), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LRM)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 08/19/2022. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A planning conference to discuss case progression, dispositive motions, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on August 19, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LRM)
November 12, 2021 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The parties did not consent, in writing, to disposition of the case by a magistrate judge. Pursuant to NEGenR.1.4(a)(3)(C)(ii). Case reassigned to Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LRM)
November 11, 2021 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Jennifer L. Turco Meyer on behalf of Plaintiffs George Johnson, Lisa Rentz Johnson.(Turco Meyer, Jennifer)
October 29, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 of C.R. England, Inc. by Attorney David C. Mullin on behalf of Defendant C.R. England, Inc..(Mullin, David)
October 14, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant C.R. England, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESTRICTED HEARING INSTRUCTIONS AND ORDER. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LRM)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 11/12/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LRM)
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by C.R. England, Inc., Dyllan Andrus Miller (Mullin, David)
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Dyllan Andrus Miller on 9/25/2021. (Turco Meyer, Jennifer)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant C.R. England, Inc. on 9/21/2021. (Turco Meyer, Jennifer)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendants C.R. England, Inc. and Dyllan Andrus Miller. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Defendant Dyllan Andrus Miller and Defendant C.R. England, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Turco Meyer, Jennifer)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4478609), by Attorney Jennifer L. Turco Meyer on behalf of Lisa Rentz Johnson, George Johnson(Turco Meyer, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. C.R. England, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Rentz Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer L. Turco Meyer
Represented By: Michael J. Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer L. Turco Meyer
Represented By: Michael J. Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. England, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dyllan Andrus Miller
Represented By: David C. Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?