Howard v. Union Pacific Railroad Co.
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Howard
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Co.
Case Number: 8:2021cv00396
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Union Pacific Corporation, Corporate Parent Union Pacific Corporation for Union Pacific Railroad Co.. by Attorney Sarah M. Gorsche on behalf of Defendants Union Pacific Railroad Co., Union Pacific Corporation, Union Pacific Corporation.(Gorsche, Sarah)
November 8, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Co. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
November 5, 2021 Filing 7 Defendant's Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by Union Pacific Railroad Co. (Moore, Scott)
November 5, 2021 Filing 6 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Partial Motion to Dismiss/Judgment on the Pleadings #5 by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Moore, Scott)
November 5, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Partial Motion to Dismiss/Judgment on the Pleadings by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Co..(Moore, Scott)
October 13, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Union Pacific Railroad Co. regarding Complaint #1 . YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LAC)
October 12, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Thompson, Nicholas)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Jeffrey Howard ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4493996)Jeffrey Howard(Thompson, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Union Pacific Railroad Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Howard
Represented By: Nicholas D. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Co.
Represented By: Scott P. Moore
Represented By: Sarah M. Gorsche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?