Evans v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Plaintiff: Vickie Evans
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Case Number: 8:2021cv00397
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand request for trial location by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London (Hammes, Matthew)
December 3, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. Waiver sent on 10/7/2021. (Hammes, Matthew)
December 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Matthew D. Hammes on behalf of Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London (Hammes, Matthew)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London on 10/13/2021. (Fitzgerald, Mark)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Certain Underwriters of Lloyd's, London regarding Complaint #1 . (Fitzgerald, Mark)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BNEDC-4494164), by Attorney Mark D. Fitzgerald on behalf of Vickie Evans(Fitzgerald, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Evans
Represented By: Mark D. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Represented By: Matthew D. Hammes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?