InterimLNHA, Inc. v. Parkview Home, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: InterimLNHA, Inc.
Defendant: Parkview Home, Inc., Farmers State Bank, Christopher D Gray and Christopher D. Gray
3Rd Party Defendant: Thomas J. Estopare and Daniel R. Stockdale
Case Number: 8:2021cv00443
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Brian J. Fahey on behalf of Plaintiff InterimLNHA, Inc..(Fahey, Brian)
January 14, 2022 Filing 26 Summons Issued as to defendant Thomas J. Estopare, Daniel R. Stockdale. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL)
January 14, 2022 Filing 25 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Parkview Home, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(JAB)
January 13, 2022 Filing 24 Summons Requested as to Thomas J. Estopare regarding Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, #22 . (Guenzel, Cameron)
January 13, 2022 Filing 23 Summons Requested as to Daniel R.Stockdale regarding Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, #22 . (Guenzel, Cameron)
January 13, 2022 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Thomas J Estopare, Daniel R Stockdale regarding Complaint, #1 filed by InterimLNHA, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against InterimLNHA, Inc., Thomas J Estopare, Daniel R Stockdale regarding Complaint, #1 filed by InterimLNHA, Inc. by Parkview Home, Inc. (Guenzel, Cameron)
January 4, 2022 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Parkview Home, Inc. on 12/23/2021. (Fahey, Brian)
January 3, 2022 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Farmers State Bank for Farmers State Bank. by Attorney Richard P. Jeffries on behalf of Defendants Farmers State Bank, Farmers State Bank.(Jeffries, Richard)
January 3, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by Farmers State Bank, Christopher D. Gray (Jeffries, Richard)
December 21, 2021 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to defendant Parkview Home, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
December 21, 2021 Filing 17 Summons Requested as to Parkview Homes, Inc. regarding Complaint, #1 . (Fahey, Brian)
December 21, 2021 Filing 16 Summons Requested as to Paul Pieper regarding Complaint, #1 . (Fahey, Brian)
December 21, 2021 Filing 15 Summons Requested as to David Vogltance regarding Complaint, #1 . (Fahey, Brian)
December 21, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Requested as to Lou Ann Parr regarding Complaint, #1 . (Fahey, Brian)
December 21, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Requested as to Laurie Urban regarding Complaint, #1 . (Fahey, Brian)
December 21, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Requested as to Mary Jo Wheeler regarding Complaint, #1 . (Fahey, Brian)
December 21, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Requested as to Oelkers & Associates, LLC regarding Complaint, #1 . (Fahey, Brian)
December 21, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Requested as to David Oelkers regarding Complaint, #1 . (Fahey, Brian)
December 21, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant Parkview Home, Inc.. (Fahey, Brian)
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Farmers State Bank on 12/13/2021; Christopher D. Gray on 12/13/2021. (Fahey, Brian)
November 29, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendants Farmers State Bank, Christopher D. Gray, and Parkview Home, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
November 29, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to Chris Gray regarding Complaint, #1 . (Fahey, Brian)
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to Farmers State Bank regarding Complaint, #1 . (Fahey, Brian)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Parkview Home, Inc. regarding Complaint, #1 . (Fahey, Brian)
November 22, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff InterimLNHA, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
November 22, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Farmers State Bank, Christopher D Gray, Parkview Home, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4524452), by Attorney Brian J. Fahey on behalf of InterimLNHA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fahey, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: InterimLNHA, Inc. v. Parkview Home, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: InterimLNHA, Inc.
Represented By: Brian J. Fahey
Represented By: Robert W. Futhey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parkview Home, Inc.
Represented By: Cameron E. Guenzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers State Bank
Represented By: Richard P. Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher D Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher D. Gray
Represented By: Richard P. Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Thomas J. Estopare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Daniel R. Stockdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?