Thompson v. City of Omaha - Police Department
Plaintiff: Kenneth Eugene Thompson
Defendant: City of Omaha - Police Department
Case Number: 8:2021cv00463
Filed: December 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Filing 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Kenneth Eugene Thompson, 2551 Dodge Street, Omaha, NE 68131 regarding Memorandum and Order, #10 . Mail was resent to Kenneth Eugene Thompson, 5302 North 27th Avenue Omaha, NE 68111. (TCL)
January 27, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address on behalf of Plaintiff Kenneth Eugene Thompson. (TCL)
January 27, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Kenneth Eugene Thompson.(TCL)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff must update his address within 30 days. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action without further notice to Plaintiff. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: February 17, 2022: check for address. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
January 14, 2022 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Kenneth Eugene Thompson, 2551 Dodge Street, Omaha, NE 68131 regarding Memorandum and Order #8 . Mail not resent, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. (TCL)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $4.71 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiffs institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: February 2, 2022: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed to pro se plaintiff and institution) (LRM)
December 27, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address on behalf of Plaintiff Kenneth Eugene Thompson (Attachments: #1 Clerk's response to plaintiff's letter)(LRM)
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 PRISONER ACCOUNT CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Kenneth Eugene Thompson. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LRM)
December 7, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. Letter sent to Candace Gaines at Douglas County Corrections. (LRM)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2020-01: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LRM)
December 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (LRM)
December 7, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Kenneth Eugene Thompson.(LRM)
December 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Omaha - Police Department filed on behalf of Kenneth Eugene Thompson. (LRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. City of Omaha - Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Eugene Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Omaha - Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?