Urgent Care Clinic of Lincoln, P.C. v. PracticeMax, Inc.
Plaintiff: Urgent Care Center of Lincoln, P.C. and Urgent Care Clinic of Lincoln, P.C.
Defendant: PracticeMax, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2022cv00077
Filed: February 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2022 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Kristina J. Kamler on behalf of Defendant PracticeMax, Inc..(Kamler, Kristina)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 5/9/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
April 6, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #3 by PracticeMax, Inc. (Kamler, Kristina)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the Summons Returned Executed #8 is stricken for the following reason: document is incomplete. The document has been refiled at filing #9 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (ADB)
March 30, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant PracticeMax, Inc.. (Kinney, Todd)
March 29, 2022 Filing 8 STRICKEN - SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant PracticeMax, Inc. on 3/25/2022. (Kinney, Todd) Modified on 3/30/2022 to strike per order 10 (ADB).
March 10, 2022 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Todd C. Kinney on behalf of Plaintiff Urgent Care Clinic of Lincoln, P.C..(Kinney, Todd)
March 7, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendant PracticeMax, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL)
March 7, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to PracticeMax, Inc. regarding Amended Complaint #3 . (Kinney, Todd)
March 2, 2022 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Urgent Care Clinic of Lincoln, P.C. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
March 1, 2022 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant PracticeMax, Inc., by Attorney Todd C. Kinney on behalf of Urgent Care Center of Lincoln, P.C.(Kinney, Todd)
February 28, 2022 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (DKM)
February 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against PracticeMax, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4585139), by Attorney Todd C. Kinney on behalf of Urgent Care Center of Lincoln, P.C.(Kinney, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Urgent Care Clinic of Lincoln, P.C. v. PracticeMax, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Urgent Care Center of Lincoln, P.C.
Represented By: Todd C. Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Urgent Care Clinic of Lincoln, P.C.
Represented By: Todd C. Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PracticeMax, Inc.
Represented By: Kristina J. Kamler
Represented By: Stephen G. Olson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?