Farm Bureau Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. CHS Inc.
Plaintiff: Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company and Farm Bureau Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: CHS Inc. and CHS Inc. doing business as Cenex Harvest States Grainland
Case Number: 8:2022cv00137
Filed: April 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2022 Filing 18 Certificate of Service - Initial Disclosures by Attorney Michelle D. Hurley on behalf of Plaintiff Farm Bureau Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Hurley, Michelle)
June 6, 2022 Filing 17 Certificate of Service - Initial Disclosures by Attorney Michelle D. Hurley on behalf of Plaintiff Farm Bureau Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Hurley, Michelle)
June 4, 2022 Filing 16 Certificate of Service - Defendant CHS, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures by Attorney Brandon M. Meyers on behalf of Defendant CHS Inc..(Meyers, Brandon)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROTECTIVE ORDER - Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order in their Rule 26(f) Planning Report, (Filing No. #12 ), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 5/5/23. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A planning conference to discuss case progression, dispositive motions, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on May 5, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
May 4, 2022 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The parties did not consent, in writing, to disposition of the case by a magistrate judge. Pursuant to NEGenR.1.4(a)(3)(C)(ii). Case reassigned to Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LRM)
May 4, 2022 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Michelle D. Hurley on behalf of Plaintiff Farm Bureau Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Hurley, Michelle)
April 20, 2022 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Michelle D. Hurley on behalf of Plaintiff Farm Bureau Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Hurley, Michelle)
April 15, 2022 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #9 for attorney Brandon M. Meyers. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
April 15, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brandon M. Meyers Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4617426 by Attorney Brandon M. Meyers on behalf of Defendant CHS Inc..(Meyers, Brandon)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 5/13/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
April 13, 2022 Filing 6 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Brandon M. Meyers has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
April 13, 2022 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
April 13, 2022 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
April 12, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by CHS Inc. (Hook, April)
April 12, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney April N. Hook on behalf of Defendant CHS Inc..(Hook, April)
April 12, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company from District Court of Garden County, Case number CI 22 0000008 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4615483) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney April N. Hook on behalf of CHS Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit Farm Bureau, #3 Exhibit CHS)(Hook, April)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farm Bureau Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. CHS Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michelle D. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm Bureau Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michelle D. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHS Inc.
Represented By: April N. Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHS Inc. doing business as Cenex Harvest States Grainland
Represented By: April N. Hook
Represented By: Brandon M. Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?