Johnson v. Sirius Computer Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jason F Johnson and Jason F. Johnson
Defendant: Sirius Computer Solutions, Inc. and CDW, LLC
Case Number: 8:2022cv00158
Filed: April 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2022 Filing 23 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss #18 by Attorney Levi Giovanetto on behalf of Defendants CDW, LLC, Sirius Computer Solutions, Inc..(Giovanetto, Levi)
June 10, 2022 Filing 22 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss #18 by Attorney Colin J. Bernard on behalf of Plaintiff Jason F. Johnson.(Bernard, Colin)
May 23, 2022 Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #17 for attorney Daniel J. Collins. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
May 23, 2022 Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #16 for attorney Levi Giovanetto. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - Consent Deadline set for 6/24/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
May 20, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by Attorney Daniel J. Collins on behalf of Defendants CDW, LLC, Sirius Computer Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Collins, Daniel)
May 19, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4638611 by Attorney Daniel J. Collins on behalf of Defendants CDW, LLC, Sirius Computer Solutions, Inc..(Collins, Daniel)
May 19, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4638565 by Attorney Levi Giovanetto on behalf of Defendants CDW, LLC, Sirius Computer Solutions, Inc..(Giovanetto, Levi)
May 16, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant CDW, LLC on 5/9/2022. (Bernard, Colin)
May 9, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Sirius Computer Solutions, Inc. on 5/2/2022. (Bernard, Colin)
May 4, 2022 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to defendant CDW, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JES)
May 4, 2022 Filing 12 Summons Requested as to CDW LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Bernard, Colin)
May 4, 2022 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant CDW, LLC. (Bernard, Colin)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Ashley R. Fischer-Foxall and Rubina S. Khaleel are granted leave to withdraw as counsel for the plaintiff and shall no longer receive electronic notice in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
April 29, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney Rubina S. Khaleel on behalf of Plaintiff Jason F. Johnson.(Khaleel, Rubina)
April 29, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to defendant CDW, LLC, Sirius Computer Solutions, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (ADB)
April 29, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Requested as to CDW LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Bernard, Colin)
April 29, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to Sirius Computer Solutions Inc regarding Complaint #1 . (Bernard, Colin)
April 28, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Colin J. Bernard on behalf of Plaintiff Jason F. Johnson (Bernard, Colin)
April 28, 2022 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER that the filing fee in the amount of $402.00 is refunded to the payor, Rubina S. Khaleel, receipt number ANEDC-4622066. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (DKM)
April 25, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Ashley R. Fischer has not registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
April 25, 2022 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
April 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BNEDC-4622066), by Attorney Rubina S. Khaleel on behalf of Jason F Johnson(Khaleel, Rubina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Sirius Computer Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason F Johnson
Represented By: Rubina S. Khaleel
Represented By: Ashley R. Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason F. Johnson
Represented By: Ashley R. Fischer-Foxall
Represented By: Colin J. Bernard
Represented By: Rubina S. Khaleel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sirius Computer Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Collins
Represented By: Levi Giovanetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDW, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Collins
Represented By: Levi Giovanetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?