First United Methodist Church et al v. Becerra et al
Plaintiff: First United Methodist Church and Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, United States Department of Health & Human Services and Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Case Number: 8:2022cv00175
Filed: May 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395 HHS: Adverse Reimbursement Review
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2022 Filing 18 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendants Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, United States Department of Health & Human Services.(Wagner, Lynnett)
May 25, 2022 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. for Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company. by Attorney Dan H. Ketcham on behalf of Plaintiffs Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company, Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc..(Ketcham, Dan)
May 24, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Xavier Becerra, Secretary of the US Dept. of Health & Human Svcs. defendant Xavier Becerra on 5/16/2022. (Ketcham, Dan)
May 24, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon US Dept. of Health & Human Svc, c/o Xavier Becerra defendant United States Department of Health & Human Services. (Ketcham, Dan)
May 24, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon US Dept. of Health & Human Svc, c/o Attorney General of the US, US Dept. of Justice, c/o Merrick Garland defendant United States Department of Health & Human Services on 5/16/2022. (Ketcham, Dan)
May 24, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services c/o Attorney General of the US, US Dept. of Justice, c/o Merrick Garland defendant Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services. (Ketcham, Dan)
May 24, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services defendant Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services on 5/16/2022. (Ketcham, Dan)
May 17, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services c/o Jan W. Sharp, US Attorney for the Dist. of NE, US Attorney's Office defendant Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services on 5/13/2022. (Ketcham, Dan)
May 16, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon US Dept of Health & Human Svc, c/o Jan W. Sharp, US Atty for the Dist of NE, US Atty's Office defendant United States Department of Health & Human Services on 5/12/2022. (Ketcham, Dan)
May 16, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Xavier Becerra c/o Jan W. Sharp, US Atty for the Dist. of NE, US Attorney's Office defendant Xavier Becerra on 5/12/2022. (Ketcham, Dan)
May 10, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to defendants Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, and United States Department of Health & Human Services. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
May 10, 2022 Filing 7 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
May 10, 2022 Filing 6 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Samuel A. Huckle has not registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
May 10, 2022 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
May 10, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services regarding Complaint #1 . (Ketcham, Dan)
May 10, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to United States Department of Health & Human Services regarding Complaint #1 . (Ketcham, Dan)
May 10, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Xavier Becerra regarding Complaint #1 . (Ketcham, Dan)
May 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4632559), by Attorney Dan H. Ketcham on behalf of Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company, First United Methodist Church(Ketcham, Dan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First United Methodist Church et al v. Becerra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First United Methodist Church
Represented By: Dan H. Ketcham
Represented By: Samuel A. Huckle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Dan H. Ketcham
Represented By: Samuel A. Huckle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Lynnett M. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health & Human Services
Represented By: Lynnett M. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Represented By: Lynnett M. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?