81-20 Grain, LLC v. Guthmiller et al
Plaintiff: 81-20 Grain, LLC
Defendant: Shaun Guthmiller and Ryan Guthmiller
Case Number: 8:2022cv00329
Filed: September 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Brian C Buescher
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service by Attorney David A. Domina on behalf of Defendant Ryan Guthmiller (Domina, David)
November 4, 2022 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE by Attorney David A. Domina on behalf of Defendant Ryan Guthmiller.(Domina, David)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER- Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 11/18/2022.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (MKR)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESTRICTED TELEPHONE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS AND ORDER. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
October 6, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand Trial Location Designation by Shaun Guthmiller (Copple, David)
September 28, 2022 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Thomas E. Jeffers on behalf of Plaintiff 81-20 Grain, LLC.(Jeffers, Thomas)
September 22, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Thomas E. Jeffers on behalf of Plaintiff 81-20 Grain, LLC (Jeffers, Thomas)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Shaun Guthmiller shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by October 6, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
September 21, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney David E. Copple on behalf of Defendant Shaun Guthmiller.(Copple, David)
September 20, 2022 Filing 5 Ryan Guthmiller's ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Ryan Guthmiller (Domina, David)
September 15, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Serving documents by Attorney David A. Domina on behalf of Defendant Ryan Guthmiller (Domina, David)
September 15, 2022 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff 81-20 Grain, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
September 15, 2022 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
September 15, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against 81-20 Grain, LLC from Pierce County District Court, Case number CI 22-39 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4712461) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney David A. Domina on behalf of Ryan Guthmiller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Domina, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 81-20 Grain, LLC v. Guthmiller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 81-20 Grain, LLC
Represented By: Thomas E. Jeffers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaun Guthmiller
Represented By: David E. Copple
Represented By: Michelle M. Schlecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Guthmiller
Represented By: David A. Domina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?