City of South Sioux City, Nebraska et al v. McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: City of South Sioux City, Nebraska, Sarpy County Nebraska and Sarpy County, Nebraska
Defendant: McKinsey and Company and McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2022cv00356
Filed: October 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2022 Filing 17 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to J. Burton LeBlanc, IV, 3102 Oak Lawn Avenue, Dallas, TX 75219 regarding Order #12 . Mail resent to J. Burton LeBlanc, IV, 3102 Oak Lawn Avenue, Suite 1100, Dallas, TX 75219. (TCL)
November 22, 2022 Filing 16 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Christine C. Mansour, 3102 Oak Lawn Avenue, Dallas, TX 75219 regarding Order #12 . Mail resent to Christine C. Mansour, 3102 Oak Lawn Avenue, Suite 1100, Dallas, TX 75219. (TCL)
November 18, 2022 Filing 15 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Mark P. Pifko, 15910 Ventura Blvd, Los Angeles, CA 91436 regarding Order #13 . Mail resent to Mark P. Pifko, #1600, 15910 Ventura Blvd, Los Angeles, CA 91436. (TCL)
November 14, 2022 Filing 14 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Mark Pifko regarding Order - MDL Transfer #12 . Mail resent to same address but with suite number included: #1600, 15910 Ventura Blvd, Los Angeles, CA 91436. (ADB)
November 7, 2022 Case transferred to District of USDC-Northern District of California. Original electronic file sent. (TCL)
November 4, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case is transferred to USDC-Northern District of California, Docket No. 2996. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(TCL)
November 4, 2022 Filing 12 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Multidistrict Litigation Panel. Clerk to wait for certified copy of order to transfer the file to USDC-Northern District of California, Docket No. 2996. (TCL) Modified on 11/7/2022 to correct typo (TCL).
October 12, 2022 Filing 11 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Paul T. Farrell, Jr. has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JES)
October 12, 2022 Filing 10 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Michael J. Fuller, Jr. has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JES)
October 12, 2022 Filing 9 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Anthony J. Majestro has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JES)
October 12, 2022 Filing 8 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Peter J. Mougey has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JES)
October 12, 2022 Filing 7 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Mark P. Pifko has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JES)
October 12, 2022 Filing 6 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Christine C. Mansour has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JES)
October 12, 2022 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney J. Burton LeBlanc, IV has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JES)
October 12, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney James C. Peterson has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JES)
October 12, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Russell W. Budd has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JES)
October 12, 2022 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES)
October 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against McKinsey and Company ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4729268), by Attorney Gregory R. Abboud on behalf of City of South Sioux City, Nebraska, Sarpy County Nebraska(Abboud, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of South Sioux City, Nebraska et al v. McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of South Sioux City, Nebraska
Represented By: Gregory R. Abboud
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Christine C. Mansour
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Represented By: Mark P. Pifko
Represented By: Michael J. Fuller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarpy County Nebraska
Represented By: Gregory R. Abboud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarpy County, Nebraska
Represented By: Christine C. Mansour
Represented By: Gregory R. Abboud
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Michael J. Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Represented By: Mark P. Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?