Hlavinka Equipment Co. v. Claas of America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hlavinka Equipment Co.
Defendant: Claas of America, Inc., Dylan Diaz, Matthies Ristow, Mark Oehmke, Nick Jacobsen and G. Eric Raby
Case Number: 8:2022cv00379
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 Filing 32 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #31 by Attorney Adam Arceneaux on behalf of Defendants Dylan Diaz, Nick Jacobsen, Mark Oehmke, G. Eric Raby, Matthies Ristow.(Arceneaux, Adam)
December 21, 2022 Filing 31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Adam Arceneaux on behalf of Defendants Dylan Diaz, Nick Jacobsen, Mark Oehmke, G. Eric Raby, Matthies Ristow.(Arceneaux, Adam)
December 21, 2022 Filing 30 CLAAS of America Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand , COUNTERCLAIM with jury demand against Hlavinka Equipment Co. regarding Complaint #1 filed by Hlavinka Equipment Co. by Claas of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Dealer Agreement) (Arceneaux, Adam)
November 23, 2022 Filing 29 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #28 for attorney Greg B. Whiston. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
November 22, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4758401 by Attorney Greg B. Whiston on behalf of Plaintiff Hlavinka Equipment Co..(Whiston, Greg)
November 22, 2022 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Craig F. Martin on behalf of Plaintiff Hlavinka Equipment Co..(Martin, Craig)
November 22, 2022 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent CLAAS NORTH AMERICA HOLDINGS INC., Corporate Parent CLAAS KGaA mbH for Claas of America, Inc.. by Attorney Adam Arceneaux on behalf of Defendants Claas of America, Inc., CLAAS NORTH AMERICA HOLDINGS INC., CLAAS KGaA mbH.(Arceneaux, Adam)
November 18, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Hannah Oates on behalf of Defendants Claas of America, Inc., Dylan Diaz, Nick Jacobsen, Mark Oehmke, G. Eric Raby, Matthies Ristow (Oates, Hannah)
November 18, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Adam Arceneaux on behalf of Defendants Claas of America, Inc., Dylan Diaz, Nick Jacobsen, Mark Oehmke, G. Eric Raby, Matthies Ristow (Arceneaux, Adam)
November 16, 2022 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Nick Jacobsen on 11/12/2022. (Martin, Craig)
November 16, 2022 Filing 22 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Claas of America, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. As to all defendants, the deadline for filing an answer or other responsive pleading is extended to December 23, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TMM)
November 15, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Jill R. Ackerman on behalf of Defendants Claas of America, Inc., Dylan Diaz, Nick Jacobsen, Mark Oehmke, G. Eric Raby, Matthies Ristow (Ackerman, Jill)
November 15, 2022 Filing 19 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Leigh C. Joyce on behalf of Defendants Claas of America, Inc., Dylan Diaz, Nick Jacobsen, Mark Oehmke, G. Eric Raby, Matthies Ristow.(Joyce, Leigh)
November 15, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Leigh C. Joyce on behalf of Defendants Claas of America, Inc., Dylan Diaz, Nick Jacobsen, Mark Oehmke, G. Eric Raby, Matthies Ristow (Joyce, Leigh)
November 14, 2022 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Claas of America, Inc. on 11/8/2022. (Martin, Craig)
November 14, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Mark Oehmke on 11/10/2022. (Martin, Craig)
November 10, 2022 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to defendant Nick Jacobsen. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JES)
November 10, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant G. Eric Raby on 11/7/2022. (Martin, Craig)
November 10, 2022 Filing 13 Summons Returned Unexecuted because it was an incorrect address as to defendant Nick Jacobsen. (Martin, Craig)
November 9, 2022 Filing 12 Summons Requested as to Nick Jacobsen regarding Complaint #1 . (Martin, Craig)
November 4, 2022 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to defendants Claas of America, Inc., Dylan Diaz, Nick Jacobsen, Mark Oehmke, G. Eric Raby, and Matthies Ristow. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JES)
November 4, 2022 Filing 10 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Hlavinka Equipment Co. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(JES)
November 4, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Requested as to Nick Jacobsen regarding Complaint #1 . (Martin, Craig)
November 4, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Requested as to Mark Oehmke regarding Complaint #1 . (Martin, Craig)
November 4, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Requested as to Matthies Ristow regarding Complaint #1 . (Martin, Craig)
November 4, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to G. Eric Raby regarding Complaint #1 . (Martin, Craig)
November 4, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Martin, Craig)
November 4, 2022 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES)
November 4, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Claas of America, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 , Notice (Other) #2 . (Martin, Craig)
November 4, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of regarding Complaint #1 Civil Cover Sheet by Attorney Craig F. Martin on behalf of Plaintiff Hlavinka Equipment Co. (Martin, Craig)
November 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4746813), by Attorney Craig F. Martin on behalf of Hlavinka Equipment Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hlavinka Equipment Co. v. Claas of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hlavinka Equipment Co.
Represented By: Craig F. Martin
Represented By: Greg B. Whiston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claas of America, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Arceneaux
Represented By: Hannah Oates
Represented By: Jill R. Ackerman
Represented By: Leigh C. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dylan Diaz
Represented By: Adam Arceneaux
Represented By: Hannah Oates
Represented By: Leigh C. Joyce
Represented By: Jill R. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthies Ristow
Represented By: Adam Arceneaux
Represented By: Hannah Oates
Represented By: Jill R. Ackerman
Represented By: Leigh C. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Oehmke
Represented By: Hannah Oates
Represented By: Adam Arceneaux
Represented By: Jill R. Ackerman
Represented By: Leigh C. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Jacobsen
Represented By: Adam Arceneaux
Represented By: Hannah Oates
Represented By: Leigh C. Joyce
Represented By: Jill R. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Eric Raby
Represented By: Adam Arceneaux
Represented By: Hannah Oates
Represented By: Jill R. Ackerman
Represented By: Leigh C. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?