Wright v. United States District Court the District of Nebraska et al
Petitioner: Clifford Wright, III
Respondent: United States District Court the District of Nebraska and Joseph P. Meyer
Case Number: 8:2022cv00439
Filed: December 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION to Amend Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 on behalf of Petitioner Clifford Wright, III.(MKR)
February 15, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION on behalf of Petitioner Clifford Wright, III.(TCL)
February 15, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION to Amend Petition on behalf of Petitioner Clifford Wright, III.(TCL)
February 13, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION to Amend Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 on behalf of Petitioner Clifford Wright, III.(MKR)
February 10, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION to Amend Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 on behalf of Petitioner Clifford Wright, III.(MKR)
February 8, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Change of Address on behalf of Petitioner Clifford Wright, III (MKR)
February 6, 2023 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Clifford Wright III supporting misinformed Plaintiff filed on behalf of Petitioner Clifford Wright, III.(MKR)
February 6, 2023 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Clifford Wright III supporting unjustified likelihood ratio, incomplete, unreliable STRmix DNA results filed on behalf of Petitioner Clifford Wright, III.(MKR)
February 6, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION to Amend Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 on behalf of Petitioner Clifford Wright, III.(MKR)
February 2, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION filed on behalf of Petitioner Clifford Wright, III.(MKR)
February 1, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Amend Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 on behalf of Petitioner Clifford Wright, III.(MKR)
February 1, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Amend Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 on behalf of Petitioner Clifford Wright, III.(MKR)
February 1, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Disclosure of Jencks material on behalf of Petitioner Clifford Wright, III.(MKR)
February 1, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Disclosure of Brady Material on behalf of Petitioner Clifford Wright, III.(MKR)
January 30, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 on behalf of Petitioner Clifford Wright, III.(MKR)
January 30, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 on behalf of Petitioner Clifford Wright, III. (ADB)
January 30, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Authorize Payments and Monitor DNA Testing on behalf of Petitioner Clifford Wright, III. (ADB)
January 27, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 on behalf of Petitioner Clifford Wright, III.(MKR)
January 27, 2023 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Clifford Wright III supporting DNA Evidence exhibit on behalf of Petitioner Clifford Wright, III.(MKR)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend. In accordance with NECivR 15.1(b), the Court will consider Plaintiff's Motion to Amend as supplemental to his original Petition and direct the Clerk's Office to update the Court's records to reflect that Filing No. 8 is a motion and supplement to his Petition. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (ADB)
January 23, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address on behalf of Petitioner Clifford Wright, III (MKR)
January 17, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend Petition and Supplement to Petition #1 on behalf of Petitioner Clifford Wright, III. (LRM) Modified on 1/24/2023 to reflect document is also a supplement per order #10 (ADB).
January 12, 2023 TEXT ENTRY THAT FILING fee paid on behalf of Clifford Wright, III on 01/12/2023. Receipt number 8065723, in the amount of $ 5.00. (JES)
January 12, 2023 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 on behalf of Petitioner Clifford Wright, III. (MKR)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Petitioner's request to proceed IFP, Filing No. #2 , is denied. Petitioner must pay the $5.00 filing fee within 30 days. Petitioner is warned that if the fee is not paid as required, the Court may dismiss this case without further notice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: February 2, 2023: deadline for Petitioner to pay $5.00 filing fee. No further review of this case will take place until the filing fee is paid. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LRM)
December 30, 2022 Filing 5 PRISONER ACCOUNT CERTIFICATE by Petitioner Clifford Wright, III. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (MKR)
December 20, 2022 Filing 4 LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. (MKR)
December 20, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (MKR)
December 19, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Petitioner Clifford Wright, III.(MKR)
December 19, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by pro se petitioner Clifford Wright, III. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. United States District Court the District of Nebraska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clifford Wright, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States District Court the District of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joseph P. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?