Gray v. Sabatka-Rine
Petitioner: Neland Tevionn Gray, Jr.
Respondent: Diane Sabatka-Rine
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 8:2023cv00018
Filed: January 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2023 TEXT ENTRY THAT FILING fee paid on behalf of Neland Gray Jr. on 3/6/23. Receipt number 8066189, in the amount of $ 5.00. (ADB)
February 27, 2023 Filing 6 LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. (MKR)
February 21, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel on behalf of Petitioner Neland Tevionn Gray, Jr.. (LKO)
January 30, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Petitioner Neland Tevionn Gray, Jr.. (LKO)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner is directed to submit the $5.00 fee to the Clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send to Petitioner the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The Clerk of the Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: February 21, 2023: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
January 19, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
January 19, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed on behalf of pro se petitioner Neland Tevionn Gray, Jr. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Sabatka-Rine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Neland Tevionn Gray, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Diane Sabatka-Rine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Michael T. Hilgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?