Stone v. Olderbak Georgetown/Willows LLC
Plaintiff: Michelle Stone
Defendant: Olderbak Georgetown/Willows LLC
Case Number: 8:2023cv00026
Filed: January 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Brian C Buescher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Harrison Kratochvil on behalf of Defendant Olderbak Georgetown/Willows LLC (Kratochvil, Harrison)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Olderbak Georgetown/Willows LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TJM)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant Olderbak Georgetown/Willows LLC, by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Michelle Stone(Moore, Scott)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #6 by Attorney Lily Amare on behalf of Defendant Olderbak Georgetown/Willows LLC.(Amare, Lily)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Lily Amare on behalf of Defendant Olderbak Georgetown/Willows LLC.(Amare, Lily)
February 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Olderbak Georgetown/Willows LLC on 2/9/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moore, Scott)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Olderbak Georgetown/Willows LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JES)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Requested as to OLDERBAK GEORGETOWN/WILLOWS LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Moore, Scott)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (TCL)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Olderbak Georgetown/Willows LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4790027), by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Michelle Stone(Moore, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stone v. Olderbak Georgetown/Willows LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Stone
Represented By: Addison C. McCauley
Represented By: Scott P. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olderbak Georgetown/Willows LLC
Represented By: Harrison Kratochvil
Represented By: Lily Amare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?