United States of America v. $980,050.00 United States Currency
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $980,050.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Claimant: Ahmed Alrumaihi
Case Number: 8:2023cv00363
Filed: August 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2023 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting AMENDED by Attorney Kimberly C. Bunjer on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Bunjer, Kimberly)
October 10, 2023 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Kimberly C. Bunjer on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Bunjer, Kimberly)
September 19, 2023 Filing 15 Verified CLAIM by Ahmed Alrumaihi (Amarin, Matthew)
September 19, 2023 Filing 14 RETURN of service of Notice of Judicial Forfeiture Proceeding and a copy of the Verified Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem on August 16, 2023 upon Ahmed Al-Rumaihi by Attorney Kimberly C. Bunjer on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Bunjer, Kimberly)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER - CONSENT Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 10/10/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (JES)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESTRICTED TELEPHONE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS AND ORDER. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
September 7, 2023 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #10 for attorney Haytham Faraj. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
September 7, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4935147 by Attorney Haytham Faraj on behalf of Defendant $980,050.00 United States Currency.(Faraj, Haytham)
September 5, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Ahmed Alrumaihi (Amarin, Matthew)
August 29, 2023 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #7 for attorney Matthew M. Amarin. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
August 28, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4929388 by Attorney Matthew M. Amarin on behalf of Defendant $980,050.00 United States Currency.(Amarin, Matthew)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR PUBLICATION - This matter is before the Court on the Motion for Publication (Filing No. #5 ), filed by the United States of America. The Motion is granted and the United States is directed to publish such notification as requested. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (JES)
August 15, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION FOR PUBLICATION by Attorney Kimberly C. Bunjer on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Bunjer, Kimberly)
August 15, 2023 Filing 4 WARRANT IN REM (COPY) Issued. (Copy e-mailed to USA) (JES)
August 15, 2023 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES)
August 15, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM by Attorney Kimberly C. Bunjer on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Bunjer, Kimberly)
August 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $980,050.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY, by Attorney Kimberly C. Bunjer on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(Bunjer, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $980,050.00 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kimberly C. Bunjer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $980,050.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Represented By: Haytham Faraj
Represented By: Matthew M. Amarin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ahmed Alrumaihi
Represented By: Matthew M. Amarin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?