Kaipust v. Daimler Truck North America, LLC
Plaintiff: Jamie Kaipust
Defendant: Daimler Truck North America, LLC and Daimler Trucks North America, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Critical Supply Solutions, Inc. and Yorkwind Crawford
Case Number: 8:2023cv00437
Filed: October 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2023 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Yorkwind Crawford. Waiver sent on 11/9/2023. (Kleffner, Michael)
November 20, 2023 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Critical Supply Solutions, Inc.. Waiver sent on 11/9/2023. (Kleffner, Michael)
November 15, 2023 Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #21 for attorney Gary L. Shumway. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
November 15, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice G. Lynn Shumway Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4976532 by Attorney Gary L. Shumway on behalf of Plaintiff Jamie Kaipust.(Shumway, Gary)
November 14, 2023 Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #16 for attorney Robert T. Adams. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
November 14, 2023 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #15 for attorney Michael J. Kleffner. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
November 14, 2023 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #14 for attorney Mackenzie Stout. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
November 14, 2023 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #13 for attorney Jennifer J. Artman. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
November 13, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4974507 by Attorney Robert T. Adams on behalf of Third Party Plaintiff Daimler Truck North America, LLC, Defendant Daimler Truck North America, LLC.(Adams, Robert)
November 13, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4974504 by Attorney Michael J. Kleffner on behalf of Third Party Plaintiff Daimler Truck North America, LLC, Defendant Daimler Truck North America, LLC.(Kleffner, Michael)
November 13, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4974501 by Attorney Mackenzie Stout on behalf of Third Party Plaintiff Daimler Truck North America, LLC, Defendant Daimler Truck North America, LLC.(Stout, Mackenzie)
November 13, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4974495 by Attorney Jennifer J. Artman on behalf of Third Party Plaintiff Daimler Truck North America, LLC, Defendant Daimler Truck North America, LLC.(Artman, Jennifer)
October 27, 2023 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #11 for attorney Joseph M. McGreevy. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
October 26, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph McGreevy Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4964737 by Attorney Joseph M. McGreevy on behalf of Plaintiff Jamie Kaipust.(McGreevy, Joseph)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER A Third-Party Complaint has been filed. (See Filing No. #9 ). Accordingly, the Rule 26(f) Meeting Report deadline set in Filing No. #7 is stayed pending further order of the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CEW)
October 24, 2023 Filing 9 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Critical Supply Solutions, Inc., Yorkwind Crawford, by Attorney Dan H. Ketcham on behalf of Daimler Truck North America, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Ketcham, Dan)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS AND ORDER. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LRM)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 11/13/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LRM)
October 13, 2023 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Other Affiliate Daimler Truck & Buses US Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate Daimler Truck & Buses US Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate Daimler Truck AG, Other Affiliate Daimler Truck AG for Daimler Truck North America, LLC. by Attorney Dan H. Ketcham on behalf of Defendants Daimler Truck North America, LLC, Daimler Truck & Buses US Holding, LLC, Daimler Truck & Buses US Holding, LLC, Daimler Truck AG, Daimler Truck AG.(Ketcham, Dan)
October 12, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 and Jury Demand by Daimler Truck North America, LLC (Ketcham, Dan)
October 6, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Joe M. McGreevy has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JES)
October 6, 2023 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Daimler Truck North America, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (JES)
October 6, 2023 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES)
October 5, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Jamie Kaipust from District Court of Lancaster Co., NE, Case number CI 23-2909 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4952594) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Dan H. Ketcham on behalf of Daimler Truck North America, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ketcham, Dan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaipust v. Daimler Truck North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler Truck North America, LLC
Represented By: Dan H. Ketcham
Represented By: Jennifer J. Artman
Represented By: Mackenzie Stout
Represented By: Michael J. Kleffner
Represented By: Robert T. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler Trucks North America, LLC
Represented By: Dan H. Ketcham
Represented By: Jennifer J. Artman
Represented By: Mackenzie Stout
Represented By: Michael J. Kleffner
Represented By: Robert T. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Kaipust
Represented By: Eric R. Chandler
Represented By: Joe M. McGreevy
Represented By: Gary L. Shumway
Represented By: Joseph M. McGreevy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Critical Supply Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Yorkwind Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?