Unified System Division, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Petitioner: Unified System Division, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Case Number: 8:2023cv00442
Filed: October 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 153 National Railroad Adjustment Board
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESTRICTED CASE TELEPHONE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JAB)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 12/20/2023. Mandatory disclosures shall be served on or before 12/20/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JAB)
November 17, 2023 Filing 16 RESPONSE regarding Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, #14 by Attorney David O'Brien Suetholz on behalf of Counter Defendant Unified System Division, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters.(Suetholz, David)
November 1, 2023 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Union Pacific Corporation for Union Pacific Railroad Company. by Attorney Andrew J. Rolfes on behalf of Defendants Union Pacific Railroad Company, Union Pacific Corporation.(Rolfes, Andrew)
November 1, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint Petition to Enforce Award and Order of Public Law Board No. 7660 and Counter Petition to Vacate Award, COUNTERCLAIM against Unified System Division, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters regarding Complaint, #1 filed by Unified System Division, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Rolfes, Andrew)
October 12, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company on 10/11/2023. (McClitis, Jason)
October 12, 2023 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney David O'Brien Suetholz on behalf of Petitioner Unified System Division, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters.(Suetholz, David)
October 11, 2023 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #10 for attorney Rachel Rekowski. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
October 11, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4955279 by Attorney Rachel Rekowski on behalf of Petitioner Unified System Division, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters.(Rekowski, Rachel)
October 11, 2023 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #8 for attorney David O'Brien Suetholz. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
October 11, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4954839 by Attorney David O'Brien Suetholz on behalf of Petitioner Unified System Division, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters.(Suetholz, David)
October 11, 2023 Filing 7 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Petitioner Unified System Division, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TCL)
October 10, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
October 10, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney David O'Brien Suetholz has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
October 10, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Rachel Rekowski has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
October 10, 2023 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
October 9, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Union Pacific Railroad Company regarding Complaint, #1 . (McClitis, Jason)
October 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4953875), by Attorney Jason R. McClitis on behalf of Unified System Division, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PLB No. 7660 Award No. 203, #2 Exhibit B- Email Correspondence)(McClitis, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unified System Division, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Unified System Division, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Represented By: Jason R. McClitis
Represented By: David O'Brien Suetholz
Represented By: Rachel Rekowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?