Rowland v. Antiquity Outdoor Supply, LLC
Plaintiff: Jane Rowland
Defendant: Antiquity Outdoor Supply, LLC doing business as Hardscape Contractors
Case Number: 8:2023cv00446
Filed: October 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting the parties' joint email motion to extend the Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline to January 29, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CEW)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 12/13/2023.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL)
November 13, 2023 Filing 7 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Antiquity Outdoor Supply, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TCL)
November 9, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Antiquity Outdoor Supply, LLC (Bernard, Colin)
October 20, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Antiquity Outdoor Supply, LLC on 10/19/2023. (Simon, James)
October 11, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Antiquity Outdoor Supply, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JES)
October 11, 2023 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES)
October 11, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Antiquity Outdoor Supply, LLC d/b/a Hardscape Contractors regarding Complaint, #1 . (Simon, James)
October 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Antiquity Outdoor Supply, LLC d/b/a Hardscape Contractors ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4954723), by Attorney James Simon on behalf of Jane Rowland (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Submission From Sender Summons)(Simon, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowland v. Antiquity Outdoor Supply, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Rowland
Represented By: James Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antiquity Outdoor Supply, LLC doing business as Hardscape Contractors
Represented By: Colin J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?