Riddle v. Omaha Public Schools
Plaintiff: Justin Riddle and Justin E. Riddle
Defendant: Omaha Public Schools
Case Number: 8:2023cv00455
Filed: October 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of You have the wrong case in here for my complaint, the complaint attached is a different party and lawsuit altogether... Additionally, if this is linked to the old case, then we know baird Holm is the attorney on record, and should transfer all of the information... on behalf of Plaintiff Justin E. Riddle (Riddle, Justin)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER that this case is dismissed pursuant to the filing of the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Filing No. #18 ). This case is dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own fees, costs and expenses. The Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. #15 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
November 27, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEBRASKA JUSTIN RIDDLE, Plaintiff, v. OMAHA PUBLIC SCHOOLS, Defendant. Case No. 8:23-cv-00455 PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), Plaintiff Justin Riddle hereby gives notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice. Defendant has not served either an answer or a motion for summary judgment. Dated: 11/27/2023 Respectfully submitted, Justin Riddle Plaintiff Pro Se 402-813-2156 Justinriddle1@gmail.com on behalf of Plaintiff Justin E. Riddle (Riddle, Justin)
November 27, 2023 Filing 17 INDEX in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction #15 by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Defendant Omaha Public Schools. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David J. Kramer)(Davidson, Steven)
November 27, 2023 Filing 16 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction #15 by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Defendant Omaha Public Schools.(Davidson, Steven)
November 27, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Defendant Omaha Public Schools.(Davidson, Steven)
November 17, 2023 Filing 14 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING Brief #12 . This filing does not contain a Certificate of Compliance as required by NECivR 7.1(d)(3). This notice is for your information for future filings.(MLF)
November 16, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of PLAINTIFF'S ADDITIONAL REASON FOR ASSIGNMENT TO PRO SE DOCKET on behalf of Plaintiff Justin E. Riddle (Riddle, Justin)
November 16, 2023 Filing 12 BRIEF in opposition to Notice (Other),,, #11 by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Defendant Omaha Public Schools.(Davidson, Steven)
November 15, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Request for Assignment to Pro Se Docket Pursuant to General Order 2022-04 governing the management and assignment of pro se cases in the Nebraska District Court, Plaintiff Justin Riddle respectfully requests that this case be assigned to the Court's pro se docket overseen by the designated pro se Judges. Plaintiff is appearing pro se in this litigation, meets the definition of a pro se litigant under paragraphs 2 and 4 of the Order, and believes the case fits the criteria for inclusion on and administration through the pro se docket. Plaintiff makes this request to ensure proper consideration and management of the case in light of his pro se status. Dated: November 15th, 2023" on behalf of Plaintiff Justin E. Riddle (Riddle, Justin)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to the extent Plaintiff's filings at Filing Nos. #7 , #8 and #9 are motions for reconsideration of the Court's Order at Filing No. 4 , they are denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(MLF)
November 10, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of **Re: Notice of Procedural Discrepancy** 1. **Observation:** The court's recent order reaffirming the extension for defendant Omaha Public Schools to November 27 has been noted. However, it appears this order did not address the specific concerns raised in Plaintiff Justin Riddle's Brief in Opposition, Document 5 dated 11-03-2023. 2. **Key Issue:** Plaintiff's brief highlights a discrepancy in the defendant's requested and court-approved extension period, exceeding the standard 30 days, and argues lack of demonstrated good cause for such an extension. 3. **Request for Review:** Respectfully, it is requested that the court review the plaintiff's brief addressing the aforementioned discrepancy and provide clarification or adjustment to the extension period as deemed appropriate. **Next Steps:** - Awaiting the court's review and response to the procedural concerns raised by the Pro Se plaintiff. on behalf of Plaintiff Justin E. Riddle (Riddle, Justin)
November 3, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Plaintiff respectfully requests the Court review his Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time filed on 11/02/2023. Plaintiff seeks only fair and timely consideration of this time-sensitive matter. Thank you for your attention. on behalf of Plaintiff Justin E. Riddle (Riddle, Justin)
November 2, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE concerning pro se status filed by Plaintiff Justin E. Riddle. (JAB)
November 2, 2023 Remark - Public: CM/ECF NextGen e-filing request from pro se plaintiff Justin Riddle (also known as Justin E. Riddle). Access granted on 11/2/23. Plaintiff's name was modified on this case to match the name on his PACER account. The plaintiff's name on the docket sheet now reflects Justin E. Riddle with an alias of Justin Riddle.
October 30, 2023 Filing 5 BRIEF in opposition to Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time on behalf of Plaintiff Justin Riddle.(NMW)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. For good cause shown, Defendant shall have an extension of time to November 27, 2023, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
October 18, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Defendant Omaha Public Schools.(Davidson, Steven)
October 18, 2023 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES)
October 17, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Justin Riddle from District Court of Douglas County, Case number CI 23-7198 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BNEDC-4958731) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Omaha Public Schools (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Removal)(Davidson, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riddle v. Omaha Public Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Riddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin E. Riddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omaha Public Schools
Represented By: David J. Kramer
Represented By: Steven D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?