Jorgensen et al v. Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd Co. et al
Plaintiff: Jason Jorgensen and Jamie Jorgensen
Defendant: Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd Co. and Ghost Transportation, LLC
Case Number: 8:2023cv00471
Filed: October 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion to Extend. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the Motion to Dismiss #14 by January 12, 2024. Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd. shall file its reply brief by January 26, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
December 21, 2023 Filing 17 JOINT MOTION to Extend Joint Motion for Enlargement of Time MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #14 by Attorney Natalie M. Cuadros on behalf of Defendant Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd Co..(Cuadros, Natalie)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REASSIGNMENT ORDER This case is reassigned to Chief District Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. for disposition and is assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (LRM)
December 4, 2023 Filing 15 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #14 by Attorney Craig A. Knickrehm on behalf of Defendant Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd Co..(Knickrehm, Craig)
December 4, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Craig A. Knickrehm on behalf of Defendant Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd Co..(Knickrehm, Craig)
November 13, 2023 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #11 for attorney Natalie M. Cuadros. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
November 13, 2023 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #10 for attorney Marc S. Blubaugh. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
November 10, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4974172 by Attorney Natalie M. Cuadros on behalf of Defendant Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd Co..(Cuadros, Natalie)
November 10, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4974166 by Attorney Marc S. Blubaugh on behalf of Defendant Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd Co..(Blubaugh, Marc)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd. shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by December 4, 2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
November 2, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Craig A. Knickrehm on behalf of Defendant Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd Co..(Knickrehm, Craig)
November 2, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendant Ghost Transportation, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
November 1, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to Ghost Transportation c/o Vivian Cordova, Registered Agent regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement,, #2 , Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 , Assignment of Judges, 3 . (Fosbender, Mattea)
October 27, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Natalie M. Cuadros has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JES)
October 27, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Marc S. Blubaugh has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JES)
October 27, 2023 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES)
October 26, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Other Affiliate Transport SNL, GP, LLC, Other Affiliate Transport SNL, GP, LLC, Other Affiliate Bridgeway Logistics Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Bridgeway Logistics Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Bridgeway Connects, Inc. for Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd.. by Attorney Craig A. Knickrehm on behalf of Defendants Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd., Transport SNL, GP, LLC, Transport SNL, GP, LLC, Bridgeway Logistics Group, LLC, Bridgeway Logistics Group, LLC, Bridgeway Connects, Inc..(Knickrehm, Craig)
October 26, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd. from Washington District Court, Case number Case No. CI 23-159 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4964622) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Craig A. Knickrehm on behalf of Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Knickrehm, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jorgensen et al v. Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Jorgensen
Represented By: Mattea Fosbender
Represented By: Robert M. Slovek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Jorgensen
Represented By: Mattea Fosbender
Represented By: Robert M. Slovek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd Co.
Represented By: Craig A. Knickrehm
Represented By: Marc S. Blubaugh
Represented By: Natalie M. Cuadros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ghost Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?