Straka et al v. Clement et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Straka, Walkaway Campaign Pac and Walkaway Foundation
Defendant: David S. Clement, Brawndosnitchka, Chichivision18, mikeclover7, stonepgh, thatsquiteawalk, highenanontoo, toolejk, Miranda Dew, @Zibtara, @Brawndosnitchka, @Chichivision18, @Mikeclover7, @Stonepgh, @Highenanontoo and @Toolejk
Case Number: 8:2024cv00024
Filed: January 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Trademark
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2024 Filing 21 INDEX in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #19 by Attorney Daniel J. Gutman on behalf of Defendant @Zibtara. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Miranda Dew, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Daniel Gutman, #3 Exhibit A to Gutman Declaration, DUI Charge, #4 Exhibit B to Gutman Declaration, Criminal Charge, #5 Exhibit C to Gutman Declaration, Plea Agreement, #6 Exhibit D to Gutman Declaration, Statement of Offense, #7 Exhibit E to Gutman Declaration, Sentencing Brief)(Gutman, Daniel)
March 18, 2024 Filing 20 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #19 by Attorney Daniel J. Gutman on behalf of Defendant @Zibtara.(Gutman, Daniel)
March 18, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Daniel J. Gutman on behalf of Defendant @Zibtara.(Gutman, Daniel)
March 14, 2024 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant David S. Clement on 2/3/2024. (Coleman, Ronald)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. David S. Clement shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by March 25, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
February 19, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Leslie S. Stryker on behalf of Defendant David S. Clement.(Stryker, Leslie)
February 16, 2024 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Ronald D. Coleman on behalf of Plaintiffs Walkaway Foundation, Walkaway Campaign PAC, Brandon Straka.(Coleman, Ronald)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant Miranda Dew shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by March 18, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
February 9, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Sydney L. Hayes on behalf of Defendant @Zibtara (Hayes, Sydney)
February 9, 2024 Filing 12 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Daniel J. Gutman on behalf of Defendant @Zibtara.(Gutman, Daniel)
January 24, 2024 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to defendants @Zibtara (aka Miranda Dew) and David S. Clement. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
January 23, 2024 Filing 10 Summons Requested as to Miranda Dew regarding Complaint #1 . (Coleman, Ronald)
January 23, 2024 Filing 9 Summons Requested as to David S. Clement regarding Complaint #1 . (Coleman, Ronald)
January 23, 2024 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER regarding Pro Hac Vice admission fee in the amount of $100.00 is refunded to the payor, Ronald D. Coleman, receipt number ANEDC-5015507. Attorney is admitted to practice in the U.S. District Court of Nebraska full-time. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
January 23, 2024 Filing 7 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Walkaway Foundation. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
January 23, 2024 Filing 6 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Walkaway Campaign PAC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
January 22, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-5015507 by Attorney Ronald D. Coleman on behalf of Plaintiffs Brandon Straka, Walkaway Campaign PAC, Walkaway Foundation.(Coleman, Ronald)
January 22, 2024 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Trademark. Complaint filed on 1/19/24. Notification sent to the U.S. Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (LKO)
January 22, 2024 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Ronald D. Coleman has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
January 22, 2024 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
January 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5014816)Brandon Straka (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(McGinn, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Straka et al v. Clement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Straka
Represented By: William F. McGinn
Represented By: Ronald D. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walkaway Campaign Pac
Represented By: Ronald D. Coleman
Represented By: William F. McGinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walkaway Foundation
Represented By: Ronald D. Coleman
Represented By: William F. McGinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David S. Clement
Represented By: Brian D. Nolan
Represented By: Leslie S. Stryker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brawndosnitchka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chichivision18
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mikeclover7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: stonepgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: thatsquiteawalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: highenanontoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: toolejk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miranda Dew
Represented By: Daniel J. Gutman
Represented By: Sydney L. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: @Zibtara
Represented By: Daniel J. Gutman
Represented By: Sydney L. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: @Brawndosnitchka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: @Chichivision18
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: @Mikeclover7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: @Stonepgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: @Highenanontoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: @Toolejk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?