Ecowater Systems LLC v. Wichita Water Conditioning, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ecowater Systems, LLC and Ecowater Systems LLC
Defendant: Wichita Water Conditioning, Inc. and Wichita Water Conditioning, Inc. doing business as Hall's Culligan Water
Case Number: 8:2024cv00097
Filed: March 13, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline M DeLuca
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2024 Filing 27 REPORT on the determination of an action regarding trademark. Voluntary Dismissal filed on 5/2/24. Notification sent to the U.S. Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Voluntary Dismissal) (LKO)
May 2, 2024 Filing 26 NOTICE of Case Dismissal (Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice) by Attorney Krista M. Eckhoff on behalf of Plaintiff Ecowater Systems LLC (Eckhoff, Krista)
May 2, 2024 Remark - Public: This case has been dismissed pursuant to the filing of a Notice of Case Dismissal. (LKO)
April 26, 2024 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Katherine Q. Martz on behalf of Defendant Wichita Water Conditioning, Inc..(Martz, Katherine)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER granting #21 the parties' joint motion for an extension of time for Defendant Wichita Water Conditioning, Inc. to file a response to the complaint #1 . Defendant shall file a responsive pleading on or before May 16, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (KLM)
April 11, 2024 Filing 23 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Wichita Water Conditioning, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(MLF)
April 11, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Katherine Q. Martz on behalf of Defendant Wichita Water Conditioning, Inc. (Martz, Katherine)
April 9, 2024 Filing 21 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Krista M. Eckhoff on behalf of Plaintiff Ecowater Systems LLC.(Eckhoff, Krista)
April 2, 2024 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Wichita Water Conditioning, Inc. on 3/26/2024. (Eckhoff, Krista)
March 28, 2024 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Other Affiliate Marmon Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Marmon Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Marmon Water, Inc, Other Affiliate Marmon Water, Inc, Other Affiliate Marmon Food, Beverage & Water Technologies Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Marmon Food, Beverage & Water Technologies Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Marmon Retail Technologies Company, Other Affiliate Marmon Retail Technologies Company for Ecowater Systems LLC. by Attorney Krista M. Eckhoff on behalf of Plaintiffs Ecowater Systems LLC, Marmon Water, Inc, Marmon Water, Inc, Marmon Food, Beverage & Water Technologies Company, LLC, Marmon Food, Beverage & Water Technologies Company, LLC, Marmon Retail Technologies Company, Marmon Retail Technologies Company, Marmon Holdings, Inc., Marmon Holdings, Inc., Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Berkshire Hathaway, Inc..(Eckhoff, Krista)
March 21, 2024 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER regarding Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #12 . Pro Hac Vice admission fee in the amount of $100.00 is refunded to the payor, receipt number ANEDC-5053483. This receipt did not post to the case, but did post in pay.gov. The fee is a duplicate of receipt number ANEDC-5053546. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
March 20, 2024 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #15 for attorney Michael J. Harris. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
March 20, 2024 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #14 for attorney Michael J. Sebba. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
March 20, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-5053731 by Attorney Michael J. Harris on behalf of Plaintiff Ecowater Systems LLC.(Harris, Michael)
March 20, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-5053723 by Attorney Michael J. Sebba on behalf of Plaintiff Ecowater Systems LLC.(Sebba, Michael)
March 20, 2024 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #12 for attorney Kathleen P. Duffy. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
March 20, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-5053546 by Attorney Kathleen P. Duffy on behalf of Plaintiff Ecowater Systems LLC.(Duffy, Kathleen)
March 19, 2024 Filing 11 Summons Requested as to Wichita Water Conditioning, Inc. regarding Complaint, #1 . (Eckhoff, Krista)
March 14, 2024 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to defendant Wichita Water Conditioning, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
March 14, 2024 Filing 9 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding a trademark. Complaint filed on 03/13/2024. Notification sent to U.S. Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (LRM)
March 14, 2024 Filing 8 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Ecowater Systems LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
March 14, 2024 Filing 7 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Kathleen P. Duffy has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
March 14, 2024 Filing 6 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Michael J. Sebba has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
March 14, 2024 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Michael J. Harris has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
March 14, 2024 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
March 13, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of regarding Complaint, #1 (Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark) by Attorney Krista M. Eckhoff on behalf of Plaintiff Ecowater Systems, LLC (Eckhoff, Krista)
March 13, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to WICHITA WATER CONDITIONING, INC. d/b/a HALL'S CULLIGAN WATER regarding Complaint, #1 . (Eckhoff, Krista)
March 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Wichita Water Conditioning, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5049396), by Attorney Krista M. Eckhoff on behalf of Ecowater Systems, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Summary of Marks, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Registration Certificate, #3 Exhibit Ex C - EcoWater's Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Eckhoff, Krista)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ecowater Systems LLC v. Wichita Water Conditioning, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ecowater Systems, LLC
Represented By: Krista M. Eckhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ecowater Systems LLC
Represented By: Kathleen P. Duffy
Represented By: Krista M. Eckhoff
Represented By: Michael J. Harris
Represented By: Michael J. Sebba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wichita Water Conditioning, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wichita Water Conditioning, Inc. doing business as Hall's Culligan Water
Represented By: Katherine Q. Martz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?