Starr v. Navy Federal Credit Union et al
Plaintiff: Edgar Starr
Defendant: Navy Federal Credit Union, Mary McDuffe and John Collins
Case Number: 8:2024cv00103
Filed: March 21, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment on behalf of Plaintiff Edgar Starr.(TCL)
May 2, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE Regarding Service on behalf of Plaintiff Edgar Starr. (JES)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, Filing No. #2 , is granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff's motion for summons, Filing No. #5 , is denied without prejudice to reassertion as premature. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in his case will be for the Court to conduct an initial review of his claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The Court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JES)
April 3, 2024 Filing 7 TEXT NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY by Deputy Clerk that the Complaint #1 , Brief #4 has been filed and is considered deficient because the document is not signed. The plaintiff shall correct the deficiency within 14 days of the date of this entry or the pleading may be stricken from the record of this case. See NECivR 11.1. (JES) Modified on 4/9/2024 to reflect satisfied on 4/9/2024 (JES).
March 29, 2024 Remark - Public: CM/ECF NextGen electronic filing request received from pro se plaintiff Edgar Starr. Access granted on 3/29/24. (JLS)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2022-04: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JES)
March 21, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Summons on behalf of Plaintiff Edgar Starr. (JES)
March 21, 2024 Filing 4 BRIEF in support of Complaint #1 on behalf of Plaintiff Edgar Starr. (JES) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2024: #1 Corrected Pleading) (JES). Modified on 4/9/2024 to add document with signature (JES).
March 21, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (JES)
March 21, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Edgar Starr. (JES)
March 21, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against John Collins, Mary McDuffe, Navy Federal Credit Union filed on behalf of Edgar Starr. (JES) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2024: #1 Corrected Pleading) (JES). Modified on 4/9/2024 to add document with signature (JES).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starr v. Navy Federal Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navy Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary McDuffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?