Brown v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Brown, Sr.
Defendant: BNSF Logistics, LLC and BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 8:2024cv00475
Filed: December 10, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Ryan C Carson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2025 Filing 13 OBJECTION to Motion to Dismiss Party #12 by Attorney Francis E. Younes on behalf of Defendant The Estate of Jena Free.(Younes, Francis)
February 5, 2025 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Party BNSF Logistics, LLC by Attorney Allison E. Lee on behalf of Defendant BNSF Logistics, LLC.(Lee, Allison)
February 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ON MOTION TO TERMINATE THE ESTATE OF JENA FREE AS A PARTY The Motion to Terminate the Estate of Jena Free as a Party and Remove Counsel from the Service List filed by defendant the Estate of Jena Free (Estate of Free), Filing #7 , is granted. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the Estate of Jena Free as a party to this case and remove its counsel from the service list. Ordered by Judge Brian C. Buescher. (LRM)
January 21, 2025 Filing 10 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Attorney Allison E. Lee on behalf of Defendant BNSF Railway Company (Lee, Allison)
January 17, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE On or before January 31, 2025, Attorney Anita K. Anthony must register admittance and register for the System or show cause by written affidavit why compliance is not possible as required under the rules of the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. (LRM)
December 19, 2024 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent Burlington Northern Santa Fe, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company for BNSF Railway Company. by Attorney David J. Schmitt on behalf of Defendants BNSF Railway Company, Burlington Northern Santa Fe, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Berkshire Hathaway, Inc..(Schmitt, David)
December 12, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Party The Estate of Jena Free by Attorney Sarah M. Dempsey on behalf of Defendant The Estate of Jena Free. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant The Estate of Jena Free Only)(Dempsey, Sarah)
December 11, 2024 Filing 6 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney George R. Mullican has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (RMR)
December 11, 2024 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Anita K. Anthony has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (RMR)
December 11, 2024 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant BNSF Railway Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(RMR)
December 11, 2024 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant BNSF Logistics, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(RMR)
December 11, 2024 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (RMR)
December 10, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against All Plaintiffs from District Court of Lancaster County, Nebraska, Case number CI 24-2058 ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5215041) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney David J. Schmitt on behalf of BNSF Railway Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schmitt, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Robert D. Hart, I
Represented By: George R. Mullican
Represented By: David J. Schmitt
Represented By: Anita K. Anthony
Represented By: Allison E. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Robert D. Hart, I
Represented By: George R. Mullican
Represented By: David J. Schmitt
Represented By: Anne M. O'Brien
Represented By: Allison E. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Brown, Sr.
Represented By: Francis E. Younes
Represented By: Alberto Hernandez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?