Rimer v. State of Nevada ex rel Nevada Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Stanley Rimer
Defendant: Linda Adams, Dr. Romeo Aranas, Dr. Joyce Chang, Catherine Cortez-Masto, James Cox, Frank Dressen, Timothy Filson, Joseph Hanson, High Desert State Prison, Jerry Howell, CCS3 Cary Leavitt, Dr. Lee, E.K. McDaniel, Secretary of State Ross Miller, Ms. Murphy, AW Jennifer Nash, Dwight Neven, Nurse Nichole No Last Name, Jamie Rainone, Cynthia Sablica, Brian Sandoval, Tatiana Sowell, State of Nevada ex rel High Desert State Prison, State of Nevada ex rel Nevada Department of Corrections and Harold Wickham
Case Number: 2:2014cv00889
Filed: June 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER Granting Defendants' 235 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/21/017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER that Plaintiff's 212 Motion to Reconsider is DENIED because Plaintiff has failed to provide adequate grounds for this Court to reconsider its 208 Order. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER Granting Defendants' 232 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time re Remaining Scheduling Deadlines (First Request). Motions due by 1/30/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/28/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/28/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's 225 Motion for Extension of Time and Plaintiff's 226 Motion for Enlargement of Number of Requests for Admissions are Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/28/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER Granting Defendant's 210 Motion for Tiered Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/17/2016. Motions due by 12/28/2016. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/16/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 214 Motion to Extend Time re 210 Motion for Tiered Scheduling Order. Plaintiff's Responses due by 7/25/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/10/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting 35 Partial Motion to Dismiss (Defendants Lee, Sowell, Rainone, Leavitt, Cortez-Masto, Sandoval, Miller, Cox, and McDaniel are dismissed with prejudice); denying 38 and 50 Motions to Amend Complaint; directing De fendants to file answer by May 5, 2016; denying 76 , 120 , and 125 supplementary motions; and denying as moot 204 Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/21/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 150 Motion for Order to Produce Medical Records, Denying 156 Motion to Annex Court Records, Denying as moot 157 Motion to Extend Time re Admissions of Discovery, Denying 158 Motion for an Order to Allow Tooth X-Rays, Denying 168 Motion to Extend Time to Serve Defendants, Denying as moot 169 Motion for Return of Documents 153 and 164 , Denying as moot 170 Motion for Acknowledgment of Service, Denying 177 Motion for Reconsideration of document 134 , Denying [ 179 Motion for Reconsideration of document 165 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/20/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER that the Clerk shall strike Plaintiff's 153 Motion for Admissions and 164 Motion for Admissions Set 2 from the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/22/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER denying 78 Motion for U.S Marshal to Serve Interrogatories; denying 79 Motion to Cause Answer to Interrogatories; denying 80 Motion for Correspondence with Inmate Witnesses; denying 81 Motion Authorizing Photos from Inmate Witness es; denying 83 Motion for Order of Non-Obstruction or Retaliation; denying 85 Motion for Inspector General Investigation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff will be subject to sanctions if he continues to excessively file meritless discovery-related motions on the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/18/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER that 104 Motion to Stay is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 62 Motion for Order to Show Cause is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 64 Motion for Court Clerk to Provide Copies of Judicial Notices is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 68 Motion Regarding Service and Court Filings is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 69 Motion to Increase Interrogatories to 25 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 70 Motion to Conduct Depos ition is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to strike 102 as an improperly filed second reply. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 75 Motion to File Memorandums of Interrogatories Due to Deceptive Conduct is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/1/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 54 Motion to Extend Time to Serve Unserved Defendants. The time period for service under Rule 4(m) is extended until 4/22/2015. Plaintiff's 55 Motion to Increase Copy Limit is Denied as moot. Plaintiff� 39;s 56 Motion to Have the State Pay for Service by Publication is Denied. Plaintiff's 57 Motion for Clerk to Send Docket Sheet is Granted. The Clerk of Court shall issue Summons to Jamie Rainone, Joyce Chang, and Nicole Manley, and shall deliver the Summons, 25 Sealed Notice of Last Known Addresses, a copy of the 6 Amended Complaint, and a copy of this Order to the U.S. Marshal Service. Plaintiff shall have 21 days in which to furnish the U.S. Marshal with the required Form USM-285. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/16/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - documents hand delivered to USM; USM 285 forms and Docket Sheet mailed to Plaintiff - SLD)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Denying as moot Plaintiff's 29 Motion to Order the State Attorney General to Disclose Served and Unserved Defendants. Plaintiff's 30 Motion to Order the Clerk of Court to Serve Defendants or Increase Plaintiff's Copy Lim it is Granted in Part and Denied in Part. Plaintiff's motion to serve those unserved defendants is Granted only with respect to Rainone, Chang, and Manley. Plaintiff's motion to increase his copy limit is Denied as moot. Plaintiff's 30 Motion to Extend Time for Service is Granted. The time period for service under Rule 4(m) is extended an additional 60 days until 3/23/2015. Plaintiff shall provide the full name and address for Murphy in a motion requesting issuance of sum mons, if Plaintiff wishes this defendant to be served. The Clerk of Court shall issue Summons to Jamie Rainone, Joyce Chang, and Nicole Manley, and shall deliver the Summons, 25 Sealed Notice of Last Known Addresses, a copy of the 6 Amended Comp laint, and a copy of this Order to the U.S. Marshal Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/22/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - documents hand delivered to USM for service; USM 285 forms mailed to Plaintiff - SLD)
January 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that 19 Motion to Allow Examination of Plaintiff's Medical and Dental Records is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 20 Motion to Appoint Counsel is denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall electronically serve a copy of this Order and a copy of Plaintiff's 6 Amended Complaint on the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada, attention Kat Howe. Within 21 days of the date of entry of this order, the Attorney General's Office shall file a notice advising the Court and Plaintiff whom it does/does not accept service for. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/8/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copies electronically sent - SLD)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting Defendants' 14 Motion to Extend Time re 9 Screening Order. Defendants shall file their Status Report by 12/5/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rimer v. State of Nevada ex rel Nevada Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Adams
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Romeo Aranas
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Joyce Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cox
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Dressen
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Filson
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Hanson
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Desert State Prison
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Howell
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCS3 Cary Leavitt
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.K. McDaniel
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of State Ross Miller
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AW Jennifer Nash
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Neven
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Nichole No Last Name
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Rainone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Sablica
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Sandoval
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatiana Sowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada ex rel High Desert State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada ex rel Nevada Department of Corrections
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Wickham
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Rimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?