Williams v. Neven et al
Plaintiff: Michael Williams
Defendant: Fillman, Howell, Nash, Dwight W. Neven, Stroud and Treadwell
Case Number: 2:2015cv01327
Filed: July 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re 38 Settlement Conference (See Order for Details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 29 Motion to Extend Time re Scheduling Deadlines. Motions due by 6/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying 27 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/9/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 Motion to Extend Time re motions. Dispositive Motions due 6/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting 9 Motion to Proceed. FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to the Court's screening order (ECF No. 8 ), this action shall proceed.FURTHER ORDERED that this action is Stayed for 90 days.FURTHER ORDERED that any party seeking exclusion for mediation shall file a motion no later than 8/9/2016.FURTHER ORDERED that the Attorney General's Office shall advise the court no later than 8/9/2016 whether it will enter a limited notice of appearance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/19/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF and Order - JM)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCREENING ORDER Deferring ruling on 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Denying Without Prejudice 6 Motion for Production of Documents. FURTHER ORDERED that the Fourteenth Amendment due process claim relating to his transfer is dismissed with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may proceed on his Fourteenth Amendment claim related to his administrative segregation against Defendants. FURTHER ORDERED that the Eighth Amendment claim is dismissed without p rejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the First Amendment retaliation claim is dismissed without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send to Plaintiff the approved form for filing a complaint, instructions for the same, a copy of his original amended complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: Mailed Forms/Copies Per Order - JM)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that 2 Motion to Extend his Copy Work Account is GRANTED in the amount of $10.00. The Nevada Department of Corrections shall extend Plaintiff's prison copy work limit by another $10.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/10/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Neven et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight W. Neven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?