Goldsmith v. State of Nevada, ex rel et al
Plaintiff: Charles Goldsmith
Defendant: Jennifer Nash, Nevada Department of Corrections, Smith and State of Nevada, ex rel
Case Number: 2:2016cv00815
Filed: April 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that, in light of the settlement reached between the parties, the Clerk of the Court will issue a refund to Plaintiff (Charles Goldsmith) in the amount of $400.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court will send a copy of this order to the Finance Division of the Clerk's Office.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will enter an order on the stipulation to dismiss in a separate docket entry. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - MR)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that pursuant to the Court's 9 Screening Order this action shall proceed against Defendants Nash and Smith for failure to protect (Count I) only. This action is STAYED for 90 days to allow Plaintiff and Defendant(s) an opportunity to settle their dispute. The Clerk of the Court shall electronically serve a copy of this order, a copy of the 9 screening order and a copy of Plaintiff's 10 complaint on the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada, attenti on Kat Howe. The Attorney General's Office shall advise the Court Within 21 days of the date of the entry of this order whether it will enter a limited notice of appearance on behalf of Defendants for the purpose of settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 3 Motion to Extend Time to Pay Filing Fee. On or before 6/30/2016 Plaintiff shall either: (1) file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis, on the correct form with complete financial attachment s in compliance with 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a); or (2) pay the full $400 fee for filing a civil action (which includes the $350 filing fee and the $50 administrative fee). If Plaintiff does not timely comply with this order dismissal of this action may result. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/5/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice to file a new application. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court SHALL SEND Plaintiff the approved form application to proce ed in forma pauperis by a prisoner, as well as the document entitled information and instructions for filing an in forma pauperis application. IFP or filing fee due within 30 days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall retain the complaint 1 -1, but shall not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldsmith v. State of Nevada, ex rel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Goldsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada, ex rel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?