Stevens v. Dzurenda et al
Plaintiff: Theodore Stevens
Defendant: James Dzurenda, Timothy Filson, Jerry Howell, E. K. McDaniel, Jennifer Nash, Dewight Neven, State of Nevada, ex rel Nevada Department of Corrections and Bruce Stroud
Case Number: 2:2016cv02166
Filed: September 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER. The court is in receipt of discovery documents filed by plaintiff. (Notice (ECF Nos. 41, 42).) Plaintiff is advised that [u]nless the court orders otherwise, written discovery, including discovery requests, discovery responses, deposition not ices, and deposition transcripts, must not be filed with the court. LR 26-8. The court will therefore strike the discovery documents from the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 25 Plaintiff's Motion in Support of Equal Protection Claim is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 35 Plaintiff's Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties jointly file a Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by 10/24/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that 12 Motion to supplement is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff chooses to file an amended complaint, Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint within thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send to Plaintiff the approved form for filing a § 1983 complaint, instructions for the same, a copy of his original complaint (ECF No. 1-2), and a copy of his supplements (ECF No. 7, 12-1). FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff chooses not to file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the Court will screen Plaintiff's original complaint (ECF No. 1-2). FURTHER ORDERED that the motions/notices/declarations to join this case (ECF No. 8 , 9 , 10 , 15 ) are denied. The Clerk of the Court shall strike the motions/notices/declarations from the docket and the movants from the caption. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Dzurenda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dzurenda
Represented By: D. Randall Gilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Filson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Howell
Represented By: D. Randall Gilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. K. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewight Neven
Represented By: D. Randall Gilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada, ex rel Nevada Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?