Johnson v. Dicues et al
Plaintiff: Lausteveion Johnson
Defendant: Julio Calderon, James Cox, Dicues, James Dzurenda, Indian Springs, Nevada, Kay, Jennifer Nash, OMD, Ray, Howard Skulnik and Brian Williams
Case Number: 2:2017cv03045
Filed: December 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER. Plaintiff's 67 motion to compel is hereby DENIED as moot and without prejudice. Plaintiff's 68 motion requesting oral argument is hereby DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/14/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting 69 Motion to Extend Time re 67 Motion to Compel (First Request). Responses due by 6/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/22/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 46 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint in Part is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 51 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DEN IED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 60 Plaintiff's Motion for Oral Arguments via Video or Teleconference is DENIED. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 40 Motion to Extend Time re 32 Amended Complaint (Second Request). Defendants answer due 2/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This action shall proceed (see order for details). Nevada Department of Corrections shall pay to the Clerk, 20% of the preceding month's deposits to Plain tiff's account. Proof of service due by 1/30/2020. No later than November 22, 2019, the Attorney General's Office shall file a notice advising the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: NDOC - JM)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER to Produce Bernard Young, #1125646. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USM - MR)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED ORDER to Produce Lausteveion Johnson. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USM - MR)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to Produce Lausteveion Johnson. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USM - MR) (Replaced to correct text on 1/07/19) (BEL).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Dicues et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julio Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dicues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Springs, Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OMD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Skulnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lausteveion Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?