Peck v. State of Nevada, ex rel et al
Plaintiff: Frank M. Peck
Defendant: Barbara Cegavski, Dugan, James Dzurenda, Jaques Grahmn, Adam Laxalt, Alexis Lonzano, Julie Matousec, Jennifer Nash, Nevada Department of Corrections, Prison Commissioners, Joel Queroz, Perry Russell, Brian Sandoval, State of Nevada, T. Tiernes, Frank A. Toddre, II, Jerry A. Wiese, Brian Williams, Dwaine Wilson and Ennis Wright
Case Number: 2:2018cv00237
Filed: February 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting 152 Motion to Extend Time; Re: 142 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting 143 Motion to Extend Time; Re: 142 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 12/5/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER denying 140 Motion; Defendants' answer due 10/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting 134 Motion to Extend Time; Second Amended Complaint deadline: 8/7/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting 106 Motion to Dismiss (see order for details); ORDER denying 123 Motion for Leave to File Document; ORDER denying 125 Motion; ORDER denying 129 Motion; Second Amended Complaint deadline: 6/15/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER denying 114 Motion to Strike; ORDER granting 116 Motion to Extend Time; Re: 106 Motion to Dismiss, Replies due by 11/8/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting in part 64 Motion; ORDER denying 87 Motion; ORDER denying 95 Motion for Sanctions; Defendants must file a statement no later than July 30, 2019 regarding the camera/video. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER denying 68 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; ORDER denying 69 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; ORDER denying 81 Motion; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER that Magistrate Judge Ferenbach's 61 and 63 Orders are AFFIRMED in their entirety and Plaintiff's 66 Objection is OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 76 Motion to Extend Time; Re: 68 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 69 Motion for TRO. Responses due by 5/28/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER that Plaintiff may proceed in this action with his First Amended Complaint. Defendants State of Nevada ex rel., the Nevada Department of Corrections, the Board of Prison Commissioners, and Judge Wiese remain dismissed with prejudice. Within 21 days of the date of entry of this order, the Attorney General's Office shall file a notice advising the Court. Defendants have 90 days from the date of this Order to file and serve an answer or other response to the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying 50 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion; ORDER denying 23 Motion; ORDER granting 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.Nevada Department of Corrections shall pay to the Clerk of the United States Dist rict Court, District of Nevada, 20% of the preceding month's deposits to Plaintiff's account. Service must be perfected within ninety (90) days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: NDOC, Finance - JM)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that the Office of the Attorney General must file a status report on or before December 21, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that the 90-day stay is extended until two days after the rescheduled Inmate Early Mediation Conference. It is further ordered that the Office of the Attorney General shall file a status report no later than two days after the rescheduled Inmate Early Mediation Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Re: 15 Motion to Continue Hearing. The Early Inmate Session scheduled for September 28, 2018, is VACATED. The court will reschedule the Early Inmate Session at a later date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that a decision on 1 the application to proceed in forma pauperis is deferred. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court interprets 8 Peck's motion for preservation of evidence as notice to Defendants to preserve the rele vant video evidence. Defendants are so notified through Peck's filing and this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 4 Peck's motion for temporary restraining order shall not be reopened and 9 his motion for reconsideration is dismissed, w ithout prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 9 Peck's motion for sealing of his motion for reconsideration and this order is denied. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peck v. State of Nevada, ex rel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Cegavski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaques Grahmn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis Lonzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Matousec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prison Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Queroz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Tiernes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank A. Toddre, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry A. Wiese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwaine Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ennis Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank M. Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?