Hendrix v. State of Nevada et al
Plaintiff: Jamal Damon Hendrix
Defendant: Romeo Aranas, Jayson Artinger, Renee Baker, Leah Bothe, D. Bradford, Harold M. Byrne, James Greg Cox, Jesse Cox, Vance E. Crowder, D. Drummond, Michael Fletcher, Sheryl L. Foster, Angela Gregersen, Robert Huston, Dawn Jones, T. Jones, Steven Kimbrell, Dr. Michael Koehn, Kraft, G. Luce, Keri Lyons, Nevada, State Of, Jeanette Ornelas, Michael Oxborrow, D. Pinkham, C. Rigney, Darlene Varady, Brian E. Williams, Sr. and Winsor
Case Number: 3:2015cv00155
Filed: March 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER that certifies any in forma pauperis appeal from its order of dismissal would be frivolous or would not be taken "in good faith" pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3). Plaintiff's in forma pauperis status should be revoked on appeal. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH) Modified on 11/15/2018 to format(LH).
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER that the R&R (ECF No. 141 ) is accepted and adopted in its entirety; Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice; Clerk directed to enter judgment and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER that the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendations ECF No. 118 is accepted and adopted in full; ECF No. 84 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part; ECF No. 122 Motion to Seal is granted. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Jamal Damon Hendrix against D. Pinkham re ECF No. 128 Order. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 2/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER that ECF No. 127 Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default as to Defendant Pinkham is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting ECF Nos. 83 / 113 Motion for Leave to File Documents under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 8/8/2017, granting Plaintiff's ECF No. 102 Motion for Reconsideration re ECF Nos. 94 -1, 94 -2, 94 -3 Exhibits; directing Clerk to correlate them to Plaintiff's ECF No. 97 Opposition to Defendants' ECF No. 84 Partial Motion for Summary Judgment. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 6/16/2017, denying Plaintiff's ECF No. 90 Motion for the Court to Construe Motion for Subpoena on Defendant D. Pinkham Liberally. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER DENYING ECF No. 82 Motion for Subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER REGARDING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb ECF No. 76 is accepted and adopted in its entirety; ECF No. 33 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is denied. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 04/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's ECF No. 59 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re ECF No. 37 Notice re 4m Dismissal : Michael Fletcher, Bradford (aka Doris Brashford, true name Doris Parenteau), and Leah Bothe are dismissed without prejudice from this action. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 41 Motion : Plaintiffs copy work limit shall be increased by $8.00. The Clerk shall send a copy of this order extending copy work to the Chief of Inmate Services. (Mailed to NDOC 11/15/2016.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/15/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER - ECF No. 1 IFP Application is GRANTED; however, full $350 filing fee must still be paid. NDOC shall pay clerk from inmate account. Clerk shall SEND copy this order to Finance, and to NDOC inmate services. (Email (NEF) to Finance; m ail to NDOC on 8/19/2016.) Clerk shall electronically SERVE AG this order and copy of amended complaint (ECF No. 13 , 16 ). (E-service 8/19/2016; Complaint and supplement via NEF regeration.) AG shall advise by 9/9/2016 re acceptance of service, or file Ds address under seal if service not accepted. If service not accepted P shall file a motion re unserved Ds. If service accepted, then answer due 10/18/2016. Henceforth P shall serve Ds a copy of every pleading submitted for consideration, together with a certificate of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying ECF No. 21 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/30/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 6/13/2016, denying Plaintiff's ECF No. 19 Motion to Exclude Case from Mediation. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER directing Plaintiff to submit clarification re 13 Amended Complaint within 21 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendrix v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romeo Aranas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayson Artinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leah Bothe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold M. Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Greg Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vance E. Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl L. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Gregersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Huston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Kimbrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Michael Koehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Luce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keri Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada, State Of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanette Ornelas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Oxborrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Pinkham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Rigney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Varady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian E. Williams, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winsor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamal Damon Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?