Collins v. Collins et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Collins
Defendant: Aranas, Baca, Daral Baugh, B. Clark, Joshua Collins, Deal, Foster, Gedney, Hightower, Irvin, Keith, R. Legrand, Marr, E.K. McDaniel, Rexwinkel, Skulstad, Smith and L. Walsh
Case Number: 3:2016cv00111
Filed: February 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER DISMISSING CASE - ECF No. 292 Stipulation is granted. This matter is dismissed, in its entirety, with prejudice, and each party will bear their own attorney fees and costs. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER that this case is stayed sua sponte pending a determination relating to the global settlement. ECF Nos. 255 , 261 , and 265 are denied without prejudice to Plaintiff refiling once the stay is lifted. Briefing will proceed as t o ECF No. 267 only because that motion directly concerns the parties' settlement and briefing will aid the Court in resolving the ongoing disputes. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 257 AMENDED ORDER Scheduling a Settlement Conference for 10/28/2019 at 10:30 AM in Reno Fifth Floor Chambers before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. The settlement conference statements shall be received in the Reno Clerk's Office - Ro om 301 not later than 4:00 PM on 10/21/2019. DO NOT DELIVER OR MAIL COPIES TO THE CLERKS OFFICE; DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 8/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER Scheduling a Settlement Conference for 10/28/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb to be held at Northern Nevada Correctional Center, 1721 Snyder Avenue, Carson City, Nevada, 89701. The settlement conference sta tements shall be received in Reno Chambers - Suite 405 not later than 4:00 PM on 10/21/2019. DO NOT DELIVER OR MAIL COPIES TO THE CLERKS OFFICE; DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER - The Reports and Recommendations (ECF Nos.[ 235], 237 ) are accepted and adopted in full. Defendants' counter-motion to dismiss (ECF No. 158 ) and motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 181 ), are granted in part, and d enied in part as specified herein. The Court grants summary judgment to Defendants LeGrand and McDaniel because Plaintiff's claims against them are time-barred. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 126 ) is granted in part, and denied in part : It is granted as to Defendants Baca, Irvin, and Walsh but denied as to Defendants Keith, Deal, Foster and Skulstad. Defendants' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 181 ) is granted in part, and denied in part as specified herein. Clerk shall strike Plaintiff's reply briefs (ECF Nos. 244 , 248 ). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER that overrules Plaintiff's objections (ECF Nos. 117 , 125 , 157 , 228 ); the Court will strike the reply briefs related to these objections (ECF Nos. 171 , 140 , 230 ); Plaintiff's motion to withdraw and strike his objec tion (ECF No. 156 ) is granted; Plaintiff's objection (ECF No. 154 ) will be stricken; Defendants' motion for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's objection (ECF No. 124 ) is granted nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER that Defendants' motions to strike (ECF Nos. 210 , 211 , 212 , 213 ) are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER - Defendant Julie Rexwinkle is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/25/2019., (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER that Defendants' motion for leave to file medical records under seal (ECF No. 182 ) is GRANTED as to Exhibits D and E, and DENIED as to Exhibits A and I. Defendants shall ensure that Plaintiff is give prompt and reasonable access to review Exhibits A and I (as well as exhibits D and E). Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER that Plaintiff's motion (ECF No. 132 ) is GRANTED, and the amended answer (ECF No. 127 ) is STRICKEN. Defendants have up to and including October 12, 2018, to file and serve a motion for leave to amend their answer. Plaintiff will have up to and including October 26, 2018 to file and serve a response. Defendants will then have up to and including November 2, 2018 to file and serve a reply brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER re ECF No. 107 Plaintiff's Motion for Order Ordering Claims Three and Four Admitted for Defendants Failure to Deny. It would appear that rather than Plaintiff being mistaken, it would be the Defendants who have apparently overlooked the allegations which were permitted by the court to proceed (ECF No. 19 at pp.6-7) and which were a component of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint at ECF No. 20 -1 (Count III) and ECF No. 20 -2 (Count IV). Defendants shall have to and including Tuesday, September 25, 2018, to supplement their opposition (ECF No. 119 ) to explain this apparent oversight. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER denying without prejudice 94 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery and Challenge the Defendants Objections. Plaintiff again reminded that if elects to renew his motion, it must comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this court. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER that Plaintiff's "Motion for Court Order, Ordering Defendant Baca to Allow Plaintiff to Review his I-File and STG File" (ECF No. 86 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER that Plaintiff's opposition to the suggestion of death and motion to substitute (ECF No. 72 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff has ninety-days from the date of the filing of the suggestion of death (filed June 20, 2018 ) to file a motion to substitute for Rexwinkel (insofar as she is sued in her individual capacity) that identifies a proper substitute, or Rexwinkel will be dismissed from this action without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDERED P's # 1 Application to proceed IFP is GRANTED. However, even if this action is dismissed, the full filing fee must still be paid. NDOC shall pay Clerk from inmate account. Clerk shall SEND copy this Order to Finance and NDOC I nmate Services. ( E-mail (NEF) to Finance; Mailed to NDOC on 12/13/2017. ) Clerk shall SERVE this Order and Amended Complaint (ECF Nos. 20 , 20 -1, 20 -2). upon AG. (E-service to AG on 12/13/2017. Amended Complaint via NEF regenera tion.) AG shall advise by 1/3/2018. re acceptance of service; and file under seal addresses for Ds for which service not accepted. P shall file a motion re any unserved Ds. If AG accepts service, then answer to complaint due by 2/11/2018 Henceforth P shall serve Ds or Ds' counsel a copy of every document submitted, together with a certificate of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER that the Recommendation of Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb ECF No. 32 is accepted and adopted in its entirety; the motion for preliminary injunction ECF No. 21 is denied. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/07/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER the Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Case from Mediation Program and Issue a Scheduling Order ECF No. 22 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the District Judge enter an order DENYING Plaintiff's motion (ECF No. 21 ). Defendants should be required to file a notice confirming Plaintiff has had his MRI on or before October 25, 2017. Objections to R&R due by 10/25/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - A decision on the motion for preliminary injunction (ECF No. 21 ) is deferred. AG shall advise by10/6/2017 re acceptance of service; and file addresses under seal if service not accepted. Ds response to motion for preliminary injunction ( ECF No. 21 ) due by 10/6/2017; reply due 10 days after filing of response. Clerk shall e-serve AG this order, P's complaint (ECF No. 20 ), and motion for preliminary injunction (ECF No. 21 ). (E-service 9/29/2017; ECF Nos. 20 , 21 via NEF regeneration.) P's motion for reconsideration (ECF No. 23 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Claims will proceed as specified herein. The deadlines set forth in this Court's screening order (ECF No. 20 ) will remain in full effect. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying ECF No. 4 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Stay. Plaintiff will have until September 14, 2016 to file a notice of voluntary dismissal or a notice indicating his wish to proceed with this action. If Plaintiff fails to timely comply with this order, or chooses not to file a notice of any kind, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 08/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Collins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aranas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daral Baugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gedney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Legrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.K. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rexwinkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skulstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Collins
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?