March 2, 2023 |
Filing
121
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS, MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT, AND SECOND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS, AND GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL (ECF Nos. 110 , 112 , 114 , 116 ) - IT IS ORDERED that Von Tobel's motion for leave to file a r equest for sanctions, and supplemental motions, (ECF Nos. 110 , 112 , 114 ), are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to seal, (ECF No. 116 ), is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court ENTER JUDGMENT in accordance with the order dismissing this action with prejudice, (ECF No. 106 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/2/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS)
|
January 17, 2023 |
Filing
106
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE on ECF No. 104 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/17/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
September 21, 2020 |
Filing
83
ORDERED that United States Magistrate Judge Baldwin's Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 81 ), is ADOPTED and ACCEPTED. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF Nos. 56 ) is GRANTED. Pending motions (ECF Nos. 73 and 75 ) are DENIED as moot. Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
March 4, 2020 |
Filing
55
ORDER granting ECF No. 51 Motion to Extend Time : Dispositive Motions deadline extended by 31 days (4/6/2020). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
December 12, 2019 |
Filing
47
ORDER - The Clerk shall ISSUE a summons for William Everts and send the same to the USM with the address provided under seal (ECF No. 42 ). Clerk shall also SEND a copy of the first amended complaint (ECF No. 8 ), the screening order (ECF N o. 11 ), and this order to the USM for service on the defendant (Copies delivered to USM on 12/13/2019). Clerk shall SEND to plaintiff USM 285 form (Mailed form to P at NNCC on 12/13/2019). Plaintiff shall have until Friday, December 27, 2019, to complete the USM 285 service form and return it to the USM, 400 South Virginia Street, 2nd Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 12/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
August 21, 2019 |
Filing
23
ORDER - IFP Application (ECF No. 1 ) is GRANTED . NDOC shall pay Clerk $350 filing fee from inmate account. Clerk shall SEND copy this order to Finance and to NDOC Inmate Services. (Email (NEF) to Finance; copy mailed to NDOC, 8/22 /2019.) Clerk shall SERVE this Order, and First Amended Complaint (ECF No. 8 ) upon AG. (E-service 8/22/2019; Complaint (ECF No. 8 ) via NEF Regeneration.) AG shall advise by 9/12/2019 re acceptance of service; and file under seal address(es) for Ds for which service not accepted. P shall file a motion re any unserved Ds. If service accepted, then answer/response to complaint due by 10/20/2019 Henceforth P shall serve Ds a copy of every pleading submitted for consideration, together with a certificate of service. This case is no longer stayed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 8/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
February 21, 2018 |
Filing
7
ORDER that ECF No. 6 Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to file amended complaint is granted; amended complaint due by 4/14/2018; if Plaintiff chooses not to file an amended complaint, this action shall proceed immediately only against Dr. Long. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 2/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|