Redford v. US Department of Housing and Urban Development et al
Plaintiff: Jay Redford
Defendant: US Department of Housing and Urban Development, Bruce Clark, BLM Companies, LLC and Northsight Property, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01152
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons in a Civil Action as to US Department of Housing and Urban Development filed by Jay Redford. Served/Mailed on 11/15/2019. Answer Follow Up on 12/6/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Fiest, James)
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons in a Civil Action as to US Department of Housing and Urban Development filed by Jay Redford. Served/Mailed on 11/15/2019. Answer Follow Up on 12/6/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Fiest, James)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons in a Civil Action as to Northsight Property, LLC filed by Jay Redford. Served/Mailed on 11/15/2019. Answer Follow Up on 12/6/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Fiest, James)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons in a Civil Action as to BLM Companies, LLC filed by Jay Redford. Served/Mailed on 11/15/2019. Answer Follow Up on 12/6/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Fiest, James)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons in a Civil Action as to Bruce Clark filed by Jay Redford. Served/Mailed on 11/28/2019. Answer Follow Up on 12/19/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Fiest, James)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons in a Civil Action as to Bruce Clark filed by Jay Redford. Served/Mailed on 11/21/2019. Answer Follow Up on 12/12/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Fiest, James)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 Bruce Clark's ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, with jury demand filed by Bruce Clark.(Poulin, Christopher)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses issued electronically as to BLM Companies, LLC, Bruce Clark, Northsight Property, LLC, US Department of Housing and Urban Development. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
November 13, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
November 12, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-1152-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14649018535 filed by Jay Redford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver)(Fiest, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2019: #3 TEXT SEARCHABLE and ELECTRONICALLY SIGNED Complaint) (ed).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redford v. US Department of Housing and Urban Development et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Redford
Represented By: James E. Fiest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Housing and Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Clark
Represented By: Christopher J. Poulin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLM Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northsight Property, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?