Morgan v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Edward Morgan
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00639
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 5/11/2021. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 5/25/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 6/8/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER approving (with changes) #20 Proposed Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 3 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Discovery deadline 1/8/2021. Discovery Status Conference set for 12/22/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Joint Statement regarding the status of discovery due by 12/18/2020. Mediation Follow Up on 2/1/2021. Summary Judgment Motions due by 2/8/2021. (jb)
June 22, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. PRETRIAL VIDEO CONFERENCE held on 6/22/2020. Order to issue. (Pltfs Atty: Carolina Keri Tumminelli) (Defts Atty: Sean J. Milano)(Total Hearing Time: 13 minutes) (jb) Modified on 6/22/2020 to add video (jb).
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROCEDURAL ORDER re Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for June 22, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER reviewing #20 Proposed Discovery Plan (Joint). Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
June 8, 2020 Filing 20 Proposed Discovery Plan (Joint) filed by Target Corporation. (Lasna, Meredith)
June 3, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address by Carolina Keri Tumminelli on behalf of Edward Morgan(Tumminelli, Carolina)
June 3, 2020 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference via Video-Conference set for 6/22/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Follow up on Discovery Plan 6/15/2020. The preliminary pretrial conference will not be canceled and at least one counsel for each party will be required to attend. While not mandatory, the court prefers that the Joint Discovery Plan filed in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) specify a summary judgment deadline which falls after the close of discovery, but at least 120 days before trial. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(jb) Modified on 6/3/2020 to add video-conference text (jb).
June 2, 2020 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement by Target Corporation disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Lasna, Meredith)
June 2, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Meredith M. Lasna on behalf of Target Corporation Attorney Meredith M. Lasna added to party Target Corporation(pty:dft).(Lasna, Meredith)
June 2, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Target Corporation.(Milano, Sean)
June 1, 2020 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Target Corporation. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Target Corporation shall file a disclosure statement by June 8, 2020. Disclosure Statement due 6/8/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (mc)
June 1, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Carolina Keri Tumminelli, Esq. must complete an online registration form within 30 days. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. Compliance Deadline set for 7/1/2020. (mc)
May 28, 2020 Filing 14 PROCEDURAL ORDER IN TRANSFERRED CASE. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 6/29/2020. (mc)
May 28, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-639-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
May 28, 2020 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number: 1:20-cv-10583. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
May 28, 2020 Filing 12 Case transferred to the District of New Hampshire. Case File Electronically Transferred to the Clerk, District of New Hampshire, On May 28, 2020. (Paine, Matthew) [Transferred from mad on 5/28/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 11 Judge William G. Young: ORDER OF TRANSFER entered. (Gaudet, Jennifer) [Transferred from mad on 5/28/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 10 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion to Change Venue. (Gaudet, Jennifer) [Transferred from mad on 5/28/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Edward Morgan. (Paine, Matthew) [Transferred from mad on 5/28/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Change Venue by Edward Morgan.(Tumminelli, Carolina) (Main Document 8 replaced on 5/6/2020) (Paine, Matthew). [Transferred from mad on 5/28/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion to Dismiss. The motion is allowed, unless within 30 days of the date of this order, the plaintiff moves to transfer venue to the District of New Hampshire. (Gaudet, Jennifer) [Transferred from mad on 5/28/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 by Sean J. Milano on behalf of Target Corporation. (Milano, Sean) [Transferred from mad on 5/28/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Business Entity Summary, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Complaint)(Milano, Sean) [Transferred from mad on 5/28/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Target Corporation.(Milano, Sean) [Transferred from mad on 5/28/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McDonagh, Christina) [Transferred from mad on 5/28/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from mad on 5/28/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8168338 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Tracking Order, #4 Exhibit Civil Action Cover Sheet, #5 USDC Category Form, #6 Civil Cover Sheet USDC Civil Cover Sheet)(Milano, Sean) [Transferred from mad on 5/28/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Sean J. Milano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Morgan
Represented By: Carolina Keri Tumminelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?