Cullinan v. Catholic Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Leo A. Cullinan
Defendant: Catholic Medical Center, Granite One Health, MD Joseph Pepe, Alan Flanigan, Holli Holbrook, FNU LNU, Leigh-Ann Albanese, Stephen Sage, Alberto Oyola, James Deroche, Zackery Chivell, Daniel Montoya, Edward Wells, Parkland Medical Center, Ali Khairat, Larry Kessler, Madison Fiasconaro, Thomas Gallagar, FNU Galth, Manchester Police Department, Allen Aldenberg, Austin Biery, Rogerio Dias, Ryan Garland, Brendan Langton, FNU Nocella, Max Castrical and Stephen Bates
Case Number: 1:2022cv00563
Filed: December 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2023 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas Gallagar, Larry Kessler re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Cert of Service (Hadiaris, Joshua)
February 8, 2023 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas Gallagar, Larry Kessler re: #13 Notice of Attorney Appearance, Corrected Cert of Service (Hadiaris, Joshua)
February 7, 2023 Filing 15 Objection and Memo of Law to Doc 4 Plaintiff's Emergent Motion for Relief by Allen Aldenberg, Stephen Bates, Austin Biery, Max Castrical, Rogerio Dias, Ryan Garland, Brendan Langton, Manchester Police Department, FNU Nocella (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(Feeney, Dona)
February 6, 2023 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #12 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by Parkland Medical Center, Ali Khairat. ATTORNEY ALYSIA CASSOTIS HAS NOT PROPERLY FILED AN APPEARANCE IN THIS CASE AND WILL NOT APPEAR ON THE DOCKET AND WILL NOT RECEIVE ELECTRONIC NOTIFICATIONS. ATTORNEY CASSOTIS MUST REFILE THE APPEARANCE USING HER OWN FILING ACCOUNT TO APPEAR ON THE DOCKET. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.Compliance Deadline set for 2/10/2023.(de)
February 6, 2023 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Larry Kessler, Thomas Gallagar. INCORRECT certificate of service. The plaintiff is Pro So and is not an electronic filer. Cerrtificate of service should reflect and state that the Plaintiff was mailed a copy. Filer shall file an updated and corrected certificate of service using the Certificate of Service event and link the filing back to originally filed document. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.Compliance Deadline set for 2/10/2023.(de)
February 3, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Thomas Gallagar, Larry Kessler.Follow up on Objection on 2/17/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Hadiaris, Joshua)
February 3, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Hadiaris on behalf of Thomas Gallagar, Larry Kessler Attorney Joshua Hadiaris added to party Thomas Gallagar(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua Hadiaris added to party Larry Kessler(pty:dft).(Hadiaris, Joshua)
February 3, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth E. Ewing on behalf of Ali Khairat, Parkland Medical Center Appearance of Alysia Cassotis (Ewing, Elizabeth)
February 3, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth E. Ewing on behalf of Ali Khairat, Parkland Medical Center (Ewing, Elizabeth)
February 3, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ali Khairat, Parkland Medical Center. Attorney Elizabeth E. Ewing added to party Ali Khairat(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth E. Ewing added to party Parkland Medical Center(pty:dft).Follow up on Objection on 2/17/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law Memorandum of Law in support of Motion to Dismiss)(Ewing, Elizabeth)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #4 Emergency Motion. For the reasons stated within, Mr. Cullinan's Emergency Motion (Doc. No 4) is denied. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(de)
January 31, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to March 13, 2023 filed by Catholic Medical Center, Granite One Health.Follow up on Objection on 2/14/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Smart, William)
January 31, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William N. Smart on behalf of Leigh-Ann Albanese, Catholic Medical Center, Zackery Chivell, James Deroche, Granite One Health, Holli Holbrook, Daniel Montoya, Alberto Oyola, Stephen Sage, Edward Wells Attorney William N. Smart added to party Leigh-Ann Albanese(pty:dft), Attorney William N. Smart added to party Catholic Medical Center(pty:dft), Attorney William N. Smart added to party Zackery Chivell(pty:dft), Attorney William N. Smart added to party James Deroche(pty:dft), Attorney William N. Smart added to party Granite One Health(pty:dft), Attorney William N. Smart added to party Holli Holbrook(pty:dft), Attorney William N. Smart added to party Daniel Montoya(pty:dft), Attorney William N. Smart added to party Alberto Oyola(pty:dft), Attorney William N. Smart added to party Stephen Sage(pty:dft), Attorney William N. Smart added to party Edward Wells(pty:dft).(Smart, William)
January 31, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erin Marie Hoefler on behalf of Leigh-Ann Albanese, Catholic Medical Center, Zackery Chivell, James Deroche, Granite One Health, Holli Holbrook, Daniel Montoya, Alberto Oyola, Stephen Sage, Edward Wells Attorney Erin Marie Hoefler added to party Leigh-Ann Albanese(pty:dft), Attorney Erin Marie Hoefler added to party Catholic Medical Center(pty:dft), Attorney Erin Marie Hoefler added to party Zackery Chivell(pty:dft), Attorney Erin Marie Hoefler added to party James Deroche(pty:dft), Attorney Erin Marie Hoefler added to party Granite One Health(pty:dft), Attorney Erin Marie Hoefler added to party Holli Holbrook(pty:dft), Attorney Erin Marie Hoefler added to party Daniel Montoya(pty:dft), Attorney Erin Marie Hoefler added to party Alberto Oyola(pty:dft), Attorney Erin Marie Hoefler added to party Stephen Sage(pty:dft), Attorney Erin Marie Hoefler added to party Edward Wells(pty:dft).(Hoefler, Erin)
January 30, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with jury demand filed by Allen Aldenberg, Stephen Bates, Austin Biery, Max Castrical, Rogerio Dias, Ryan Garland, Brendan Langton, Manchester Police Department, FNU Nocella.(Feeney, Dona)
January 30, 2023 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION to Object to Ext. of Time by Defs.; for Protective Order; for Appointment of Counsel filed by Leo A. Cullinan.Follow up on Objection on 2/13/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(de)
January 13, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dona Feeney on behalf of Allen Aldenberg, Stephen Bates, Austin Biery, Max Castrical, Rogerio Dias, Ryan Garland, Brendan Langton, Manchester Police Department, FNU Nocella Attorney Dona Feeney added to party Allen Aldenberg(pty:dft), Attorney Dona Feeney added to party Stephen Bates(pty:dft), Attorney Dona Feeney added to party Austin Biery(pty:dft), Attorney Dona Feeney added to party Max Castrical(pty:dft), Attorney Dona Feeney added to party Rogerio Dias(pty:dft), Attorney Dona Feeney added to party Ryan Garland(pty:dft), Attorney Dona Feeney added to party Brendan Langton(pty:dft), Attorney Dona Feeney added to party Manchester Police Department(pty:dft), Attorney Dona Feeney added to party FNU Nocella(pty:dft).(Feeney, Dona)
December 28, 2022 Filing 2 Summonses issued by mail as to Leigh-Ann Albanese, Allen Aldenberg, Stephen Bates, Austin Biery, Max Castrical, Catholic Medical Center, Zackery Chivell, James Deroche, Rogerio Dias, Madison Fiasconaro, Alan Flanigan, Thomas Gallagar, FNU Galth, Ryan Garland, Granite One Health, Holli Holbrook, Larry Kessler, Ali Khairat, FNU LNU(Charge Nurse), FNU LNU(Intake Nurse), FNU LNU(Patient Liaison ), Brendan Langton, Manchester Police Department, Daniel Montoya, FNU Nocella, Alberto Oyola, Parkland Medical Center, Joseph Pepe, Stephen Sage, Edward Wells. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (mc)
December 27, 2022 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
December 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Leigh-Ann Albanese, Allen Aldenberg, Stephen Bates, Austin Biery, Max Castrical, Catholic Medical Center, Zackery Chivell, James Deroche, Rogerio Dias, Madison Fiasconaro, Alan Flanigan, Thomas Gallagar, FNU Galth, Ryan Garland, Granite One Health, Holli Holbrook, Larry Kessler, Ali Khairat, FNU LNU(Charge Nurse), FNU LNU(Intake Nurse), FNU LNU(Patient Liaison ), Brendan Langton, Manchester Police Department, Daniel Montoya, FNU Nocella, Alberto Oyola, Parkland Medical Center, Joseph Pepe, Stephen Sage, Edward Wells ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 275) filed by Leo A. Cullinan. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Summonses) (mc)
December 23, 2022 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-563-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. Disclosure Statement due 1/23/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). Case Follow Up Deadline set for 3/23/2023. (mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cullinan v. Catholic Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo A. Cullinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Medical Center
Represented By: Erin Marie Hoefler
Represented By: William N. Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite One Health
Represented By: Erin Marie Hoefler
Represented By: William N. Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Joseph Pepe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Flanigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holli Holbrook
Represented By: Erin Marie Hoefler
Represented By: William N. Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leigh-Ann Albanese
Represented By: Erin Marie Hoefler
Represented By: William N. Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Sage
Represented By: Erin Marie Hoefler
Represented By: William N. Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto Oyola
Represented By: Erin Marie Hoefler
Represented By: William N. Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Deroche
Represented By: Erin Marie Hoefler
Represented By: William N. Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zackery Chivell
Represented By: Erin Marie Hoefler
Represented By: William N. Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Montoya
Represented By: Erin Marie Hoefler
Represented By: William N. Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Wells
Represented By: Erin Marie Hoefler
Represented By: William N. Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parkland Medical Center
Represented By: Elizabeth E. Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Khairat
Represented By: Elizabeth E. Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Kessler
Represented By: Joshua Hadiaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison Fiasconaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Gallagar
Represented By: Joshua Hadiaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Galth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manchester Police Department
Represented By: Dona Feeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Aldenberg
Represented By: Dona Feeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Biery
Represented By: Dona Feeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogerio Dias
Represented By: Dona Feeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Garland
Represented By: Dona Feeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendan Langton
Represented By: Dona Feeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Nocella
Represented By: Dona Feeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Castrical
Represented By: Dona Feeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Bates
Represented By: Dona Feeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?