RAMOS v. NEW JERSEY STATE PRISON et al
Petitioner: LUIS RAMOS
Respondent: NEW JERSEY STATE PRISON, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY and STEVE JOHNSON
Case Number: 1:2016cv09139
Filed: December 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Robert B. Kugler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/20/2017. (TH, )
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER that the Clerk reopen this case. ORDERED that Petitioner shall show cause within 30 days of the date of this Order why his Petition should not be dismissed due to untimeliness. ORDERED that failure to respond may result in dismissal. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 2/17/2017. (TH, )
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM, ORDER Clerk shall administratively terminate this case. Order and IFP mailed 12/21. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/21/16. (jbk, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAMOS v. NEW JERSEY STATE PRISON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LUIS RAMOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NEW JERSEY STATE PRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STEVE JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?